United States of America v. Anthony et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Elysian Fields Independent School District, Peter J Whelpton, Susan Elizabeth Stough Anthony, Teneha Independent School District, Rusk County Tax Assessor, Panola County Tax Assessor, Beckville Independent School District, Robert R Anthony, Tatum Independent School District, Janet S Young, City of Carthage, Texas, Joaquin Independent School District, Panola County, Texas, Panola County Emergency Services District #1, Gary Independent School District, Panola College, Panola County Ground Water Conservation District and . Carthage Independent School District
Case Number: 6:2019cv00354
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 Panola County Taxing Authorities ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint Filed by United States of America by. Carthage Independent School District, Gary Independent School District, Joaquin Independent School District, Panola College, Panola County Emergency Services District #1, Panola County Ground Water Conservation District, Panola County, Texas.(Beall, Tab)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Robert R Anthony, Susan Elizabeth Stough Anthony.(LaSala, Cari)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Peter J Whelpton served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Blacker, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Beckville Independent School District waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Elysian Fields Independent School District waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Rusk County Tax Assessor waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Tatum Independent School District waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Teneha Independent School District waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Blacker, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Janet S Young served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Blacker, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Robert R Anthony waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Susan Elizabeth Stough Anthony waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Blacker, Jonathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. City of Carthage, Texas waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Blacker, Jonathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America.. Carthage Independent School District waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Gary Independent School District waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Joaquin Independent School District waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Panola College waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Panola County Emergency Services District #1 waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Panola County Ground Water Conservation District waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Panola County, Texas waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Blacker, Jonathan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Blacker, Jonathan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert R Anthony, Susan Elizabeth Stough Anthony, Peter J Whelpton, Janet S Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(mjc, )
July 31, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ksd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (ksd )
July 31, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (ksd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Blacker, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Anthony et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elysian Fields Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Whelpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Elizabeth Stough Anthony
Represented By: Cari B LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teneha Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusk County Tax Assessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panola County Tax Assessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckville Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R Anthony
Represented By: Cari B LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatum Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet S Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Carthage, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joaquin Independent School District
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panola County, Texas
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panola County Emergency Services District #1
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Independent School District
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panola College
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panola County Ground Water Conservation District
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Carthage Independent School District
Represented By: Tab Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan L Blacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?