Moore v. Ryder System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Moore, Jr.
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc., Ryder Truck Rental Inc, Ryder System, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Not Yet Classified: William Joseph Cornelius
Case Number: 6:2019cv00370
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. All filings to be made in active Marshal case 2:18-cv-428. (gsg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Ryder Truck Rental Inc Defendant Ryder Rental, Inc.'s Notice of Submission to the Court of Ryder's Third-Party Petition for its Review in Determining Granting Leave of Court to Permit Filing (Veness, Hermon)
August 15, 2019 Case transferred in from Marshall Division on 08/15/2019 Case Number 2:18-cv-428 filed by Ryder Truck Rental Inc.(ksd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Petition Against Third Party Defendant Stanley Carl Clark by Ryder Truck Rental Inc. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Byrne, Richard)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part #18 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/14/2019. (nkl, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 Defendant Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404 filed by Ryder Truck Rental Inc. (Veness, Hermon)
June 25, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Eugene Moore, Jr. (McGuire, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 Defendant Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.'s Certificate of Lack of Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC 1404 filed by Ryder System, Inc.. (Veness, Hermon)
June 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Garcia, Paul)
June 6, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ryder Truck Rental Inc Defendant Ryder Rental, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Veness, Hermon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Ryder Truck Rental Inc Defendant Ryder Rental, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Byrne, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Eugene Moore, Jr Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Miller, Ken)
April 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (updating the year only) Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Clarkson Frederick Brown for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Attorney Krishna Reddy terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/24/2019. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2019., Discovery due by 10/10/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2019., Jury Selection set for 1/13/2020 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Mediation Completion due by 10/31/2019., Motions in Limine due by 12/12/2019., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/24/2019. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. William Cornelius is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/24/2019. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/24/2019. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/24/2019. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER assigning case to Judge Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/2019. (nkl, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Eugene Moore, Jr, Ryder Truck Rental Inc. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2019 in chambers with no recording. Keith Miller present for plaintiff. Richard Byrne and Paul Garcia present for defendant. Proposed deadlines for Docket Control Order and Discovery Order discussed. Standard protective order requested. Bill Cornelius appointed as Mediator. (bga, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Strike Krishna Reddy and Martina Meritz, Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Clarkson F. Brown by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Strike and to Substitute Counsel)(Garcia, Paul)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Ryder Truck Rental Inc. (Byrne, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
April 18, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/22/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. *Note that only the TIME has changed*(bga, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2019 01:50 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/21/2019. (nkl, )
December 10, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Byrne, Richard)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.'s Original Answer ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Ryder Truck Rental Inc.(Byrne, Richard)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 DEFENDANT, LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCs, ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Reddy, Krishna)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Eugene Moore, Jr Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (McGuire, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Ryder Truck Rental Inc. by and through its Registered Agent, Corporate Creations Network, Inc. (nkl, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryder Truck Rental Inc, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, filed by Eugene Moore, Jr.(McGuire, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Lowe's Companies, Inc. CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Reddy, Krishna)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Lowe's Companies, Inc. CONCERNING REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Reddy, Krishna)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Reddy, Krishna)
November 6, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lowe's Companies, Inc..(Reddy, Krishna)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/2018. (nkl, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Lowe's Companies, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company. (nkl, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Ryder System, Inc. c/o Robert D. Fatovic, Registered Agent. (nkl, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ken Keith Miller on behalf of Eugene Moore, Jr (Miller, Ken)
October 12, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6981764.), filed by Eugene Moore, Jr.(McGuire, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Ryder System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Krishna Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental Inc
Represented By: Richard John Byrne
Represented By: Hermon L Veness, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder System, Inc.
Represented By: Hermon L Veness, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Krishna Reddy
Represented By: Clarkson Frederick Brown
Represented By: Paul Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Ken Keith Miller
Represented By: Michael Shane McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: William Joseph Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?