Goldstein v. Facebook Inc.
Plaintiff: Leonid Goldstein
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00389
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 2019.10.18 Wong Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Wong Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Wong Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond), #10 First MOTION for Entry of Default Facebook Inc.; Denied as moot #10 Motion for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/27/2019. (ksd )
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) filed by Leonid Goldstein. (Goldstein, Leonid)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond), #10 First MOTION for Entry of Default Facebook Inc. filed by Facebook Inc.. (Thames, Earl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Entry of Default Facebook Inc. by Leonid Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Leonid)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) filed by Leonid Goldstein. (Goldstein, Leonid)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) filed by Facebook Inc. ORDERED that Plaintiff respond to Defendants motion for extended time by September 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/19/2019. (gsg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonid Goldstein. Facebook Inc served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (gsg)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/11/2019. (gsg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to File Electronically by Leonid Goldstein. (gsg)
August 28, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent Form to Plaintiff. (mll, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Facebook Inc., and given to plaintiff for service. (mll, )
August 28, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-48874 (mll, )
August 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leonid Goldstein. (mll, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc., filed by Leonid Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonid Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?