Basey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Basey and Patricia Fawcett
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2019cv00411
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT. The court hereby enters judgment that all claims in in the matter are dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 10/25/2019. (slo, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. All claims in this matter are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 10/25/2019. (slo, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dial, Karl)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw #11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/27/2019. (srb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Robert Weir on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Weir, Jared)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Dial, Karl)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (ksd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffith, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Samir Wahby on behalf of All Defendants (Wahby, Peter)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Glenn Dial on behalf of All Defendants (Dial, Karl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph P Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 An email was sent to all attorneys in this matter advising them that they will need to apply for admission to practice in the EDTX. The link to our webpage with instructions was also supplied. (ksd )
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ksd )
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00586. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Amended Complaint filed by Patricia Fawcett. Document entered in wrong case. All documents for this case must be filed in the MDL - 15-md-02641-DGC. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants filed by Patricia Fawcett.(Ballesteros, Jose) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-00586-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15192416 filed by Barbara Ann Basey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Basey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fawcett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Karl Glenn Dial
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Jared Robert Weir
Represented By: Peter Samir Wahby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Karl Glenn Dial
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Jared Robert Weir
Represented By: Peter Samir Wahby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?