Crawford v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Eugenia Crawford
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2019cv00412
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw #10 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/27/2019. (srb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Robert Weir on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Weir, Jared)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (ksd )
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffith, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Griffith, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Samir Wahby on behalf of All Defendants (Wahby, Peter)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Glenn Dial on behalf of All Defendants (Dial, Karl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph P Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ksd )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01285. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1285-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16569677 filed by Eugenia Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Crawford
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?