Mays v. Davis
Petitioner: Randall Wayne Mays
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 6:2019cv00426
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254ex
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as Moot Motion to Stay Execution by Randall Wayne Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(VerHagen, Derek)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Stay Execution by Randall Wayne Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(VerHagen, Derek)
September 24, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn re related case 6:11cv135. Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/23/2019. (mjc, )
September 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin added. (mjc, )
September 23, 2019 District Judge Marcia A. Crone added. (mjc, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Golden Bragg on behalf of Lorie Davis (Bragg, Travis)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randall Wayne Mays. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit AO240)(Schepers, Jeremy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randall Wayne Mays. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VerHagen, Derek)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek Richard VerHagen on behalf of Randall Wayne Mays (VerHagen, Derek)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Don Schepers on behalf of Randall Wayne Mays (Schepers, Jeremy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Randall Wayne Mays. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #21 Appendix, #22 Appendix, #23 Appendix, #24 Appendix, #25 Appendix, #26 Appendix, #27 Appendix, #28 Appendix, #29 Appendix, #30 Appendix)(Schepers, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Wayne Mays
Represented By: Derek Richard VerHagen
Represented By: Jeremy Don Schepers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?