Gray v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Patsy Gray
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Brittany Blake
Case Number: 6:2019cv00461
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT that all claims in this matter are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 12/9/2019. (mjc, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 12/9/2019. (mjc, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by ReliaStar Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyea, Amy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 12/23/2019. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 11/22/2019. (mjc, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 ReliaStar Life Insurance Company's ANSWER to #3 Complaint of Plaintiff Patsy Gray, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against Brittany Blake, COUNTERCLAIM against Patsy Gray by ReliaStar Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Boyea, Amy)
October 14, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ksd )
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ReliaStar Life Insurance Company filed by Patsy Gray. (Original Petition as filed in state court action.)(ksd )
October 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (ksd )
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ReliaStar Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Voya Financial, Inc. for ReliaStar Life Insurance Company. (Boyea, Amy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ReliaStar Life Insurance Company from County Court at Law No 1 of Henderson County, Texas, case number 00344-CCL-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7477028), filed by ReliaStar Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit G-1, #9 Exhibit H)(Boyea, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Gray
Represented By: James Hollis Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy B Boyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brittany Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?