Tristani et al v. Optionsellers.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani and Mark Marshall
Defendant: Optionsellers.com, Inc. and James Cordier
Case Number: 6:2019cv00585
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (Goff, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/17/2020. (gsg)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (Vitullo, Anthony)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew R. Kurland on behalf of James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7603062. (Kurland, Andrew)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jed I. Bergman on behalf of James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7603067. (Bergman, Jed)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Tristani Account Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Marshall Trust Account Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: Tarry Account Agreement, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pamphilis, Constantine)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc. (Pamphilis, Constantine)
December 12, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #4 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Optionsellers.com, Inc. to 1/3/2020; James Cordier to 1/3/2020. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc..( Pamphilis, Constantine)
December 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, )
December 9, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
December 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (mll, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc., filed by Anthony Tristani, Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiffs' Original Petition") (mll, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Optionsellers.com, Inc., James Cordier from 369th Judicial District Court of Cherokee County, Texas, case number 2019-110546. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7560667), filed by Optionsellers.com, Inc., James Cordier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pamphilis, Constantine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tristani et al v. Optionsellers.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optionsellers.com, Inc.
Represented By: Constantine Z Pamphilis
Represented By: Andrew R. Kurland
Represented By: Jed I. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cordier
Represented By: Constantine Z Pamphilis
Represented By: Andrew R. Kurland
Represented By: Jed I. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radford Tarry
Represented By: Anthony Leonard Vitullo
Represented By: James Meadows Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tristani
Represented By: Anthony Leonard Vitullo
Represented By: James Meadows Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Marshall
Represented By: Anthony Leonard Vitullo
Represented By: James Meadows Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?