Wright v. Primelending
Plaintiff: Tonya Wright
Defendant: Primelending
Case Number: 6:2020cv00036
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge K Nicole Mitchell. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 03/16/20. (mll, )
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. The scheduling conference previously set for March 6, 2020 is canceled. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/19/2020. (ndc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hopkins, Shelley)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Primelending (Hopkins, Shelley)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting rule 26 deadlines. Scheduling conference for 3/6/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/6/2020.(ndc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tonya Wright Certificate of Interested Parties (Newark, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Tonya Wright re Remark, #4 Answer to Complaint, #2 Complaint, (Newark, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Primelending.(Hopkins, Shelley)
January 27, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, )
January 27, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
January 27, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Primelending, filed by Tonya Wright. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction, Permanent Injunction, and Request for Disclosures") (mll, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Primelending from 294th Judicial District Court, Van Zandt County, Texas, case number 19-00304. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7629487), filed by Primelending. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matter Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - List of All Parties of Record)(Hopkins, Shelley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Primelending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primelending
Represented By: Shelley Luan Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?