Torres et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Torres and Doroteo Torres
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Equifax Information Services, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00086
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that parties submit closing documents no later than 6-15-2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/15/20. (mll, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC and JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Doroteo Torres, Heather Torres (Findsen, Lisbeth)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Molly)
April 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co. and Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Doroteo Torres, Heather Torres (Findsen, Lisbeth)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Sheldon, Paul)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Sheldon, Paul)
March 18, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #12 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Equifax Information Services, LLC to 4/7/2020. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 18, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to 4/9/2020. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Heather Torres, Doroteo Torres.(Findsen, Lisbeth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Russell, Molly)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Seger, Forrest)
March 16, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Equifax Information Services, LLC.( Seger, Forrest)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Experian Information Solutions, Inc..( Russell, Molly)
March 10, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #10 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for JPMorgan Chase & Co. to 4/9/2020. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re JPMorgan Chase & Co..( Schout, Marcie)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Respond re JPMorgan Chase & Co..( Schout, Marcie) Modified on 3/10/2020 (mll, ).
March 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer submitted by JPMorgan Chase & Co. The Motion is TERMINATED as deficient and filed in error. Local Rule CV-12 requires a request to extend the time to answer "shall be by application to the clerk, not motion." An Application for Extension of Time to Answer should be filed within one business day. (mll, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 TERMINATED AS DEFICIENT AND FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer)(Schout, Marcie) Modified on 3/10/2020 (mll, ).
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Torres, Doroteo Torres. JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Findsen, Lisbeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Torres, Doroteo Torres. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Findsen, Lisbeth)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Torres, Doroteo Torres. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Findsen, Lisbeth)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Torres, Doroteo Torres. Trans Union, LLC served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Findsen, Lisbeth)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DESIGNATING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 02/21/20. (mll, )
February 21, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
February 20, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
February 20, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
February 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Doroteo Torres, Heather Torres. (mll, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Trans Union, LLC and emailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ndc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7673560.), filed by Heather Torres, Doroteo Torres. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Findsen, Lisbeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Torres
Represented By: Lisbeth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doroteo Torres
Represented By: Lisbeth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Molly Jean Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Paul W Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Marcie Lynn Schout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?