Sano v. BTS Motors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nona Sano
Defendant: Todd Behringer and BTS Motors, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00135
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DESIGNATING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to handle all pretrial matters in this case, except for any motion by plaintiff for certification of a collective action or of similarly-situated status under the Fair Labor Standards Act, which is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for a report and recommendation. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 05/15/20. (mll, )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 5/27/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 4/30/2020. (ndc)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nona Sano. BTS Motors, LLC served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Sanford, Joshua)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nona Sano. Todd Behringer served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Sanford, Joshua)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nona Sano Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Sanford, Joshua)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BTS Motors, LLC, Todd Behringer.(Cates, Susan)
April 15, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BTS Motors, LLC to 4/27/2020; Todd Behringer to 4/27/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BTS Motors, LLC, Todd Behringer.( Cates, Susan)
April 14, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion for Extension of Time, Entry #3 submitted. Incorrect Docket Event. Correction should be made within 1 Business Day. (gsg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 ***Deficient Filing. Incorrect Docket Event. To be Re-Filed by Attorney.*** Unopposed MOTION for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BTS Motors, LLC, Todd Behringer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Cates, Susan) Modified on 4/14/2020 (gsg).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to BTS Motors, LLC and Todd Behringer. Emailed to plaintiff to serve. (ndc)
March 19, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
March 19, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
March 19, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7716530.), filed by Nona Sano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sano v. BTS Motors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Behringer
Represented By: Susan Elaine Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTS Motors, LLC
Represented By: Susan Elaine Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nona Sano
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?