Matlock et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Melvin Matlock, Lana Copeland, Melisa Matlock and Donald Matlock
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00197
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Pretrial Teleconference set for 6/26/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 05/18/20. (mll, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 FCA US LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC.(Scarbrough, Tanya)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Matlock, Lana Copeland, Melisa Matlock, Melvin Matlock. FCA US LLC served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Tracy, E)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to FCA US LLC and emailed to plaintiff to serve. (ndc)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Galen Counts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Counts, Andrew)
April 15, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
April 15, 2020 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7752453.), filed by Donald matlock, Lana Copeland, Melvin matlock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matlock et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Matlock
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Copeland
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisa Matlock
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Matlock
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?