James v. Hillhouse et al
Plaintiff: Eddie James
Defendant: Henderson County, Southern Health Partners, Cody Barnett, Botie Hillhouse and D Faught
Case Number: 6:2020cv00390
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and payment of filing fee by Eddie James. (mll, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cody Barnett, D Faught, Henderson County, Botie Hillhouse. (Iglesias, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Southern Health Partners Supplemental Disclosures (Cook, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to Cody Barnett on 8/10/2020, by cert mail. (mll, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to Botie Hillhouse on 8/10/2020, by cert mail. (mll, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to D Faught on 8/10/2020, by cert mail. (mll, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to Henderson County on 8/10/2020, by cert mail. (mll, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to Southern Health Partners on 8/10/2020, by cert mail. (mll, )
August 24, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Cody Barnett, D Faught, Henderson County, Botie Hillhouse.(Iglesias, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Southern Health Partners (Cook, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Administrator of Inmate Accounts, Henderson County Jail as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Received 7/28/2020. (ndc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Health Partners.(Cook, James)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Cody Barnett, D Faught, Henderson County, Botie Hillhouse, Southern Health Partners, and forwarded to the US Marshal for service. (mll, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ANSWER AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The Clerk shall issue process and the Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/20/20. (mll, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/20/20. (mll, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because the Plaintiff has no current assets, no partial filing fee shall be assessed. In the event that the Plaintiff subsequently receives deposits in his inmate trust account, the agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/20/20. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. *** MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eddie James. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie James. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cody Barnett, D Faught, Henderson County, Botie Hillhouse, Southern Health Partners, filed by Eddie James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope(s))(mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Hillhouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson County
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Represented By: James Levi Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Barnett
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Botie Hillhouse
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Faught
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?