Chumley v. Special Health Resources for Texas
Plaintiff: Keven Chumley
Defendant: Special Health Resources for Texas
Case Number: 6:2020cv00391
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Keven Chumley as to #13 Order; RECEIVED 8-27-2020. (mll, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope(s))(gsg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carroll, Frank)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 9/29/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/21/20. (mll, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF READINESS TO CONFER by Keven Chumley re #8 Order. (gsg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Keven Chumley regarding more time for orders (gsg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Keven Chumley as to #8 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Received 7/31/2020. (ndc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 8/27/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 7/29/2020. (ndc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Special Health Resources for Texas (Carroll, Frank)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Special Health Resources for Texas identifying Corporate Parent Special Health Resources for Texas for Special Health Resources for Texas. (Carroll, Frank)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Special Health Resources for Texas, filed by Keven Chumley. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint")(mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Special Health Resources for Texas. (Filed in state court as "Defendant Special Health Resources for Texas Original Answer")(mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Special Health Resources for Texas, filed by Keven Chumley. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure")(mll, )
July 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Special Health Resources for Texas. (mll, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Special Health Resources for Texas from Gregg County County Court at Law No. 2, case number 2020-118-CCL2. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7898586), filed by Special Health Resources for Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Original Answer)(Carroll, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chumley v. Special Health Resources for Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keven Chumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Health Resources for Texas
Represented By: Frank O Carroll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?