Hughes v. Credit Management, LP
Plaintiff: Sabrina Hughes
Defendant: Credit Management, LP
Case Number: 6:2020cv00456
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING DEADLINES. All case deadlines and court dates are VACATED. All relief not expressly granted in this Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/23/20. (mll, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Credit Management, LP by Sabrina Hughes (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Vacating Deadlines)(Halvorsen, Joel)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to request entry of default judgment or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/16/20. (mll, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Hughes. Sabrina Hughes served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Halvorsen, Joel)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DESIGNATING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 08/25/20. (mll, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Credit Management, LP. (ndc)
August 21, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
August 21, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
August 21, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
August 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sabrina Hughes. (mll, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Credit Management, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7961070.), filed by Sabrina Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halvorsen, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Credit Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Hughes
Represented By: Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?