Smith et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: LaVonda Smith and Ronald Smith
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00649
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 2/19/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 1/21/2021. (ndc)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Burke, Melinda)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (gsg)
December 18, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
December 18, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
December 18, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8158863.), filed by LaVonda Smith, Ronald Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Friesell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaVonda Smith
Represented By: John Riley Friesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Smith
Represented By: John Riley Friesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Melinda R Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?