Gohmert et al v. Pence Featured Case
Plaintiff: Greg Safsten, Nancy Cottle, Michael Ward, Jake Hoffman, Louie Gohmert, Tyler Bowyer, Robert Montgomery, Loraine Pellegrino, Sam Moorhead, Kelli Ward, Anthony Kern and James R. Lamon
Defendant: Michael R. Pence
Case Number: 6:2020cv00660
Filed: December 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2021 Filing 43 MANDATE of USCA as to 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Anthony Kern, Michael Ward, Tyler Bowyer, Greg Safsten, Sam Moorhead, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Loraine Pellegrino, Kelli Ward, Jake Hoffman, 40 Notice of Appeal filed by MIchele Lundgren. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(ksd )
January 2, 2021 Filing 42 USCA JUDGMENT as to 39 Notice of Appeal, filed by James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Anthony Kern, Michael Ward, Tyler Bowyer, Greg Safsten, Sam Moorhead, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Loraine Pellegrino, Kelli Ward, Jake Hoffman, 40 Notice of Appeal filed by MIchele Lundgren. (ksd )
January 2, 2021 Filing 41 EMERGENCY MOTION on 39 Notice of Appeal, 40 Notice of Appeal. (ksd )
January 2, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL by MIchele Lundgren. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-8176887. (Bundren, Wm.)
January 1, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 37 Order Dismissing Case, 38 Order by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-8176796. Appeal Record due by 1/15/2021. (Joseph, Lawrence)
January 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/1/2021. (efarris, )
January 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court dismisses the case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/1/2021. (efarris, )
January 1, 2021 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Presidential Elector, Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion (Amending and Expanding Motion to Intervene of Dec. 31, 2020 at Docket No. 15) by Alan Hamilton Kennedy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Alan)
January 1, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE by Timothy P Dowling re 19 MOTION to Intervene (Dowling, Timothy)
January 1, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND EXPEDITED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT Reply to Plaintiffs Response 1/1/21 re Rule 19 filed by Timothy P Dowling. (Dowling, Timothy)
January 1, 2021 Filing 33 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 30 Response in Support of Motion,,.. (Sessions, William)
January 1, 2021 Filing 32 BRIEF filed INTERVENORS MICHELE LUNDGREN ET.AL.S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RELIEF SOUGHT by MIchele Lundgren. (Bundren, Wm.)
January 1, 2021 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Brief to Defendant and Others by MIchele Lundgren. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bundren, Wm.)
January 1, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Support re 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND EXPEDITED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief filed by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Errata Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Sessions, William)
January 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/1/2021. (jdk1)
January 1, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Julia Zsuzsa Haller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8176550. (Haller, Julia)
January 1, 2021 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sessions, William)
January 1, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. (Sessions, William)
January 1, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene INTERVENORS MICHELE LUNDGREN ET.AL.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE by MIchele Lundgren, Marian Sheridan, Meshawn Maddock, Mari-Ann Henry, Amy Facchinello. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Intervenor Lundgren's Original Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bundren, Wm.)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/31/2020. (jdk1)
December 31, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' and Intervenors' Briefs In Opposition by Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sessions, William)
December 31, 2020 Filing 22 TRIAL BRIEF Proposed Amicus Brief by U.S. House of Representatives. (Letter, Douglas)
December 31, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by U.S. House of Representatives. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
December 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Timothy P Dowling. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order to intervene, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order to dismiss)(Dowling, Timothy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by Timothy P Dowling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Order granting motion)(Dowling, Timothy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND EXPEDITED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Michael R. Pence. (Coghlan, John)
December 31, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John V. Coghlan on behalf of All Defendants (Coghlan, John)
December 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of U.S. House of Representatives (Letter, Douglas)
December 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene as Presidential Elector, Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, and Opposition to Plaintiffs Louie Gohmert et al.'s Emergency Motion by Alan Hamilton Kennedy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Alan)
December 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alan Hamilton Kennedy on behalf of Alan Hamilton Kennedy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8175915. (Kennedy, Alan)
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief by John S. Campbell, Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope(s))(ksd )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Expedited Briefing on 2 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Declaratory Judgment - Granting In Part 7 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/29/2020. (jdk1)
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. Lamon, Kelli Ward, Nancy Cottle, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Timothy P Dowling, Michael Ward, Tyler Bowyer, Robert Montgomery, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Greg Safsten, Anthony Kern. All Defendants. (Joseph, Lawrence)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. Lamon, Kelli Ward, Nancy Cottle, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Timothy P Dowling, Michael Ward, Tyler Bowyer, Robert Montgomery, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Greg Safsten, Anthony Kern. Michael R. Pence served on 12/29/2020, answer due 2/27/2021. (Joseph, Lawrence)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Timothy P Dowling (Dowling, Timothy)
December 29, 2020 MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that a briefing schedule will be set on Plaintiffs emergency motion (Docket No. 2) after Plaintiffs file proof of service in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). (ksd)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy P Dowling on behalf of Timothy P Dowling. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8172653. (Dowling, Timothy)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Shorten Time for Response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Expedited Declaratory Judgment and Emergency Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Scheduling Order by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time)(Sessions, William)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence J Joseph on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8172359. (Joseph, Lawrence)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Proof of Service served on Stephen J. Cox on 12/29/20, filed by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. (Sessions, William)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Howard Kleinhendler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8171069. (Kleinhendler, Howard)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael R. Pence, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) US Attorney, # 2 Summons(es) US Attorney General)(mll, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND EXPEDITED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by Tyler Bowyer, Nancy Cottle, Louie Gohmert, Jake Hoffman, Anthony Kern, James R. Lamon, Robert Montgomery, Sam Moorhead, Loraine Pellegrino, Greg Safsten, Kelli Ward, Michael Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sessions, William)
December 28, 2020 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
December 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT EMERGENCY COMPLAINT FOR EXPEDITED DECLARATORY AND EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Michael R. Pence ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8169550.), filed by Louie Gohmert. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX A Arizona Joint Resolution, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sessions, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gohmert et al v. Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Safsten
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Cottle
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ward
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Hoffman
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Gohmert
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Bowyer
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Montgomery
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Pellegrino
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Moorhead
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Ward
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kern
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Lamon
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: William Lewis Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?