Jaye v. Grewal et al
Plaintiff: Chris Ann Jaye
Defendant: Robert Kugler, Freda L Wolfson, Guillermo Argote, Gubir S Grewal, Unknown Parties, William Walsh, Katherine Dupuis, C J Williams, Stuart Rabner, George David Jaye, Mandelbaum Salsburg, PC, Jacob Shunck, Ballard Spahr LLP, John Pritchard, New Assets Management, LLC and Michael O'Neill
Case Number: 6:2021cv00048
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Demand for Order Denying Review for Appeal to Fifth Circuit by Chris Ann Jaye (mll, )
March 3, 2021 APPEAL DENIED. Entered on 3/3/2021. (ndc)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Chris Ann Jaye re #9 Order of Transfer, #11 Order denying Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Supplemental Motion for Writ and Federal Intervention, #2 Envelope(s))(mll, )
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/13/21. (mll, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE and MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order to Transfer by Chris Ann Jaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope(s))(mll, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/26/2021) (mll, ).
February 1, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. CASE: 6:21-cv-00048DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 2:21-cv-01566, filed 02/01/2021. (mll, )
January 29, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to the District Court for the District of New Jersey. (mll, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/29/21. (mll, )
January 29, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 6-55582 (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Emergent Relief per All Writs Act, to Enjoin State and County Actors and to Declare Void State Orders by Chris Ann Jaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion for Emergent Relief per All Writs Act, to Enjoin State and County Actors and to Declare Void State Orders by Chris Ann Jaye (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Enjoin State Actors: First Amendment Rights by Chris Ann Jaye. (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion to Enjoin Sate Actors by Chris Ann Jaye (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Electronically by Chris Ann Jaye. (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Constitutional Question: Challenges to State Statutes, State Court Rules, State Policy carried out with the Force of Law and Judicial Immunity by Chris Ann Jaye (mll, )
January 28, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chris Ann Jaye. (mll, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chris Ann Jaye. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaye v. Grewal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freda L Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Argote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gubir S Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Dupuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Rabner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George David Jaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandelbaum Salsburg, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Shunck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard Spahr LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Assets Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Ann Jaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?