LoganTree LP v. Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LoganTree LP
Defendant: Huawei Devices USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies, Co., Ltd. and Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00119
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 5/3/2021. (efarris, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until July 21, 2021 by Huawei Devices USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LoganTree LP. Huawei Technologies, Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Shokouhi, Hossain)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LoganTree LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shokouhi, Hossain)
April 9, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Huawei Devices USA, Inc. to 5/17/2021; Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. to 5/17/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. (Geiszler, Steven)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LoganTree LP. Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Shokouhi, Hossain)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LoganTree LP. Huawei Devices USA, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Shokouhi, Hossain)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge J. Campbell Barker recused. (Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle for all further proceedings.) Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 03/26/21. (mll, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Devices USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., and Huawei Technologies, Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ndc)
March 25, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
March 25, 2021 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the courts local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
March 25, 2021 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, )
March 25, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LoganTree LP. (mll, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against LoganTree LP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8318642.), filed by LoganTree LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Shokouhi, Hossain)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LoganTree LP v. Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Devices USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies, Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LoganTree LP
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?