Becker et al v. Citibank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Becker and Liliana Becker
Defendant: Crow Roxanne, Citibank N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Yocom Darla, CitiGroup, Inc., Rukkila Patti, Urbina Gina, Fraser Jane, Roxanne Crow, Darla Yocom, Jane Fraser, Patti Rukkila and Gina Urbina
Case Number: 6:2021cv00161
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A., Roxanne Crow, Jane Fraser, Patti Rukkila, Gina Urbina, Darla Yocom. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macaluso, Tricia)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bruce Becker, Liliana Becker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s) Attachment A, #2 Envelope(s) Attachment B, #3 Envelope(s) Attachment C, #4 Envelope(s) Attachment D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Becker, Liliana)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A., Roxanne Crow, Jane Fraser, Patti Rukkila. (Macaluso, Tricia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Responses due by 7/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/18/21. (mll, )
May 15, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Bruce Becker, Liliana Becker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s) CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE, #2 Envelope(s) REDACTED MEDICAL DOCUMENTATION, #3 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Becker, Liliana)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bruce Becker, Liliana Becker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s) Attachments, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Becker, Liliana)
May 12, 2021 CM/ECF Account created pursuant to the Courts order (DE #11). Plaintiffs notified via email. (saenz, )
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2021. (gsg)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A., Roxanne Crow, Jane Fraser, Patti Rukkila, Gina Urbina, Darla Yocom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Macaluso, Tricia)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Macaluso, Tricia)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Bruce Becker, Liliana Becker. (mll, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Bruce Becker, Liliana Becker. (mll, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A., Roxanne Crow, Jane Fraser, Patti Rukkila, Gina Urbina, Darla Yocom. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macaluso, Tricia)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Citi Retail Services LLC, Other Affiliate Citicorp USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Citicorp LLC for CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A.. (Macaluso, Tricia)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, )
April 26, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
April 26, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Forms to plaintiffs. (mll, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CitiGroup, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A., Yocom Darla, Urbina Gina, Fraser Jane, Rukkila Patti, Crow Roxanne, filed by Bruce Becker, Liliana Becker. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition")(mll, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8376856), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Macaluso, Tricia) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/26/2021) (jbe, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/26/2021) (jbe, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (jbe, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker et al v. Citibank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Roxanne
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yocom Darla
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rukkila Patti
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbina Gina
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser Jane
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Crow
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Yocom
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Fraser
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Rukkila
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Urbina
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Roger W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?