Reves v. Wood County, Texas, et al
Plaintiff: Sonja Reves
Defendant: Jonathan Rose, Wood County, Texas, Thomas castloo, Sonja Reeves and Louis Dahlman
Case Number: 6:2021cv00183
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/15/2021. (efarris, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/15/2021. (efarris, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/15/2021. (efarris, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2022. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/15/2021. (efarris, )
June 15, 2021 Minute Entry for a telephonic proceeding held in chambers District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle: Scheduling Conference held on 6/15/2021. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (efarris, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION AS TO ALTERNATIVE FORMS OF DISCLSOURE by Thomas Castloo, Louis Dahlman, Jonathan Rose, Wood County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Iglesias, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION AS TO EMAIL AND FAX SERVICE by Thomas Castloo, Louis Dahlman, Jonathan Rose, Wood County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Iglesias, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ESI Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Iglesias, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Arthur Evans, III on behalf of All Defendants (Evans, James)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The Rule 16 Pretrial Conference is set for a telephonic conference on 6/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 5/11/2021. (efarris, )
May 10, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Thomas Castloo, Louis Dahlman, Jonathan Rose, Wood County, Texas, filed by Sonja Reves. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand")(mll, )
May 7, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sonja Reves. (mll, )
May 7, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, AND JURY DEMAND by Louis Dahlman, Jonathan Rose, Wood County, Texas, Thomas castloo.(Iglesias, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jonathan Rose, Thomas castloo, Wood County, Texas, Louis Dahlman from Wood County 402nd Judicial District, case number 2021-151. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8402708), filed by Jonathan Rose, Thomas castloo, Wood County, Texas, Louis Dahlman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Iglesias, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reves v. Wood County, Texas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Rose
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James Arthur Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County, Texas
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James Arthur Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas castloo
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James Arthur Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dahlman
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James Arthur Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Reves
Represented By: Ernst Mitchell Martzen
Represented By: Jason Aaron Zendeh Del
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?