Morrow et al v. Short et al
Plaintiff: Joshua William Morrow, James Clint Thornton, Charles Narramore and Cody Taylor Lashley
Defendant: James Clay Short, Matthew Goolsby, Mike Harris, Keith Beam and Vernon Mitchell
Case Number: 6:2021cv00302
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua William Morrow, Cody Taylor Lashley, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton. James Clay Short served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Roberts, James)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua William Morrow, Cody Taylor Lashley, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton. Vernon Mitchell served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Roberts, James)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua William Morrow, Cody Taylor Lashley, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton. Keith Beam served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Roberts, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Summon served on Defendant Goolsby's wife Lynn Goolsby on 09/07/2021, filed by Cody Taylor Lashley, Joshua William Morrow, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton. (Roberts, James)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT (Corrected) against All Defendants, filed by Joshua William Morrow, Cody Taylor Lashley, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton.(wea, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/20/2021. (wea, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Original Complaint-Corrected by Joshua William Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Roberts, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2021: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (wea, ).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Complaint Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/12/2021. (mll, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DESIGNATING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to the full extent authorized by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 08/10/2021. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
August 6, 2021 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
August 6, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cody Taylor Lashley, Joshua William Morrow, Charles Narramore. (mll, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Keith Beam, Matthew Goolsby, Mike Harris, Vernon Mitchell, and James Clay Short. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(ndc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H Palmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Palmer, Scott)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #2 Complaint.. (Roberts, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8526734.), filed by Joshua William Morrow, Cody Taylor Lashley, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File ORIGINAL COMPLAINT WITH PAGES IN EXCESS OF THOSE SPECIFIED IN LOCAL RULE CV-3(d) by Cody Taylor Lashley, Joshua William Morrow, Charles Narramore, James Clint Thornton. (Roberts, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow et al v. Short et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua William Morrow
Represented By: James Painter Roberts
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clint Thornton
Represented By: James Painter Roberts
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Narramore
Represented By: James Painter Roberts
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Taylor Lashley
Represented By: James Painter Roberts
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clay Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?