Mora v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Marco Mora
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, PHH Mortgage Company and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv00308
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE. The parties shall file final settlement documents by December 6, 2021, or otherwise inform the court why they were unable to file those documents. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 10/6/2021. (ndc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Company (Harris, Shawnika)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Harris, Shawnika)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 9/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. The scheduling conference set for 9/23/2021 is canceled. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 9/21/2021. (ndc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Marco Mora (Newark, Robert)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newark, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marco Mora.(Newark, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 9/20/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 8/26/2021. (ndc)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to replead to comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the court's Local Rules. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due 9/9/2021. Defendant's amended answer is due 14 days after receipt of the amended complaint. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 8/26/2021. (ndc)
August 10, 2021 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
August 10, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Company. (Filed in state court as "Defendants' Original Answer")(mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Company, filed by Marco Mora. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition, Application for Temporary Injunction, Permanent Injunction, and Request for Disclosures") (mll, )
August 9, 2021 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, PHH Mortgage Company Certificate of Interested Persons (Harris, Shawnika)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, PHH Mortgage Company identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent PHH Corporation for PHH Mortgage Company; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holding, Inc. for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1. (Harris, Shawnika)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1 from 7th Judicial District, Smith County, Texas, case number 21-1759-A. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8528519), filed by PHH Mortgage Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Ex A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit B-2 - TRO, #5 Exhibit B-3 - Defendants' Original Answer, #6 Exhibit C - List of Attorneys, #7 Exhibit D - Notice of Jury Not Requested, #8 Exhibit E - Notice of State Court Information, #9 Exhibit F - List of Parties, #10 Exhibit G - Smith CAD)(Harris, Shawnika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Mora
Represented By: Robert Clarence Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Equifirst Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-1 Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Company
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Arthur Elex Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Arthur Elex Anthony
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?