Texas Medical Association et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Texas Medical Association and Dr. Adam Corley
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Treasury, United States Office of Personnel Management, Xavier Becerra, Janet Yellen, Martin J Walsh and Kiran Ahuja
Amicus Curiae: Physicians Advocacy Institute, California Medical Association, Connecticut State Medical Society, Medical Association of Georgia, Kentucky Medical Association, Massachusetts Medical Society, Nebraska Medical Association, Medical Society of New Jersey, Medical Society of the State of New York, North Carolina Medical Society, Oregon Medical Association, South Carolina Medical Association, Tennessee Medical Association, Washington State Medical Association, Action for Health, Inc., Emergency Department Practice Management Association, Texas College of Emergency Physicians, Virginia College of Emergency Physicians and Members of Congress
Case Number: 6:2021cv00425
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR AMICI CURIAE BRIEF AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #47 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Members of Congress as Amici Curiae by January 3, 2022 filed by Members of Congress. The proposed amici may file their brief on or before January 3, 2022. Defendants may file a response to the amici curiae brief of the Members of Congress by January 18, 2022. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/24/2021. (efarris, )
December 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to File and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/24/2021. (jdk1)
December 22, 2021 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Action for Health, Inc. (Guthrie, Andrew)
December 21, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Members of Congress as Amici Curiae by January 3, 2022 filed by Kiran Ahuja, Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Treasury, United States Office of Personnel Management, Martin J Walsh, Janet Yellen. (McElvain, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order - 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order - 2) (gsg, ).
December 21, 2021 Filing 47 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Members of Congress as Amici Curiae by January 3, 2022 by Members of Congress. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ho, Allyson)
December 21, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paulette Chu Miniter on behalf of Members of Congress (Miniter, Paulette)
December 21, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allyson Newton Ho on behalf of Members of Congress (Ho, Allyson)
December 17, 2021 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Virginia College of Emergency Physicians (Bierig, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas College of Emergency Physicians (Bierig, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Emergency Department Practice Management Association (Bierig, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 41 BRIEF filed Amicus Brief by Emergency Department Practice Management Association, Texas College of Emergency Physicians, Virginia College of Emergency Physicians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Bierig, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Emergency Department Practice Management Association, Texas College of Emergency Physicians, Virginia College of Emergency Physicians. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bierig, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Emergency Department Practice Management Association, Texas College of Emergency Physicians, Virginia College of Emergency Physicians (Davis, Stafford)
December 17, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Emergency Department Practice Management Association, Texas College of Emergency Physicians, Virginia College of Emergency Physicians (Bartles, Catherine)
December 17, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jack R. Bierig on behalf of Emergency Department Practice Management Association, Texas College of Emergency Physicians, Virginia College of Emergency Physicians. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8716416. (Bierig, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 36 BRIEF filed Amicus Brief by Medical Association of Georgia. (Keller, Scott)
December 17, 2021 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by California Medical Association, Connecticut State Medical Society, Kentucky Medical Association, Massachusetts Medical Society, Medical Association of Georgia, Medical Society of New Jersey, Medical Society of the State of New York, Nebraska Medical Association, North Carolina Medical Society, Oregon Medical Association, Physicians Advocacy Institute, South Carolina Medical Association, Tennessee Medical Association, Washington State Medical Association (Do, Long)
December 17, 2021 Filing 34 BRIEF filed Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment by California Medical Association, Connecticut State Medical Society, Kentucky Medical Association, Massachusetts Medical Society, Medical Association of Georgia, Medical Society of New Jersey, Medical Society of the State of New York, Nebraska Medical Association, North Carolina Medical Society, Oregon Medical Association, Physicians Advocacy Institute, South Carolina Medical Association, Tennessee Medical Association, Washington State Medical Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Do, Long)
December 17, 2021 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment by California Medical Association, Connecticut State Medical Society, Kentucky Medical Association, Massachusetts Medical Society, Medical Association of Georgia, Medical Society of New Jersey, Medical Society of the State of New York, Nebraska Medical Association, North Carolina Medical Society, Oregon Medical Association, Physicians Advocacy Institute, South Carolina Medical Association, Tennessee Medical Association, Washington State Medical Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Do, Long)
December 17, 2021 Filing 32 BRIEF filed - Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Action for Health, Inc.. (Guthrie, Andrew)
December 17, 2021 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Action for Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guthrie, Andrew)
December 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Lunsford McElvain on behalf of All Defendants (McElvain, Joel)
December 15, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Garland Gillingham on behalf of All Defendants (Gillingham, James)
December 14, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric David Chan on behalf of California Medical Association, Connecticut State Medical Society, Kentucky Medical Association, Massachusetts Medical Society, Medical Association of Georgia, Medical Society of New Jersey, Medical Society of the State of New York, Nebraska Medical Association, North Carolina Medical Society, Oregon Medical Association, Physicians Advocacy Institute, South Carolina Medical Association, Tennessee Medical Association, Washington State Medical Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8710102. (Chan, Eric)
December 14, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Long Xuan Do on behalf of Physicians Advocacy Institute, California Medical Association, Connecticut State Medical Society, Medical Association of Georgia, Kentucky Medical Association, Massachusetts Medical Society, Nebraska Medical Association, Medical Society of New Jersey, Medical Society of the State of New York, North Carolina Medical Society, Oregon Medical Association, South Carolina Medical Association, Tennessee Medical Association, Washington State Medical Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8710087. (Do, Long)
December 10, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association re #1 Complaint Notice of Errata Concerning Plaintiffs' Complaint (Reid, Penny)
December 10, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Penny)
November 30, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Texas on 11-15-2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 30, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, including Summons served on Menick B. Garland, Attorney General of the United States on 11-22-2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion for Expedited Briefing. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/23/2021. (gsg)
November 23, 2021 In-Person Hearing on Summary Judgment Motions set for 2/4/2022 at 09:30 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. (gsg)
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reid, Penny)
November 16, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on United States Office of Personnel Management on 11-15-2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Kiran Ahuja on 11-15-2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 10, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declatory Injunction and Injunctive Relief served on Janet Yellen on 11/8/2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declatory Injunction and Injunctive Relief served on United States Department of Treasury on 11/8/2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declatory Injunction and Injunctive Relief served on Martin J. Walsh on 11/1/2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declatory Injunction and Injunctive Relief served on United States Department of Labor on 11/01/2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declatory Injunction and Injunctive Relief served on Xavier Becerra on 11/08/2021, filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Reid, Penny)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Reid, Penny)
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R LoCascio on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8649567. (LoCascio, Joseph)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Derek A Webb on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8649535. (Webb, Derek)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jaime L.M. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8649322. (nkl, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Kiran Ahuja, Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Treasury, United States Office of Personnel Management, Martin J Walsh, Janet Yellen. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es))(ndc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric D McArthur on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8649480. (McArthur, Eric)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jamie L.M. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8649322. (Jones, Jamie) Modified on 10/29/2021 (nkl, ).
October 29, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #3 , #4 , #5 , and #6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice submitted due to attorney signature inconsistent with login. Correction should be made within 1 business day.(wea, )
October 29, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 7, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
October 28, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Penny Packard Reid on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8648478. (Reid, Penny)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Penny Packard Reid on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8648475. (Reid, Penny)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Penny Packard Reid on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8648473. (Reid, Penny)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Penny Packard Reid on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8648472. (Reid, Penny)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas Medical Association (Reid, Penny)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8648439.), filed by Adam Corley, Texas Medical Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reid, Penny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Medical Association et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Medical Association
Represented By: Penny Packard Reid
Represented By: Derek A Webb
Represented By: Eric D McArthur
Represented By: Jaime L.M. Jones
Represented By: Joseph R LoCascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Adam Corley
Represented By: Penny Packard Reid
Represented By: Derek A Webb
Represented By: Eric D McArthur
Represented By: Jaime L.M. Jones
Represented By: Joseph R LoCascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Joel Lunsford McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Physicians Advocacy Institute
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut State Medical Society
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Medical Association of Georgia
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kentucky Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Medical Society
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nebraska Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Medical Society of New Jersey
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Medical Society of the State of New York
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina Medical Society
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Carolina Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tennessee Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington State Medical Association
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Action for Health, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Wade Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emergency Department Practice Management Association
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Virginia College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of Congress
Represented By: Allyson Newton Ho
Represented By: Paulette Chu Miniter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?