Ray v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Jerremy Raschaad Ray
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2021cv00504
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Proposed Summons by Jerremy Raschaad Ray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(wea, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #3 Order of Transfer by Jerremy Raschaad Ray (ljw, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for an Order to Compel Discovery by Jerremy Raschaad Ray. (ljw, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerremy Raschaad Ray. (ljw, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Introduce Discovery/Evidence in Support of Petition by Jerremy Raschaad Ray. (ljw, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
December 29, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )
December 29, 2021 Case transferred in from Lufkin Division on 12/29/2021; Case Number 9:21-cv-304. (mll, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Tyler Division of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 12/28/21. (ljw, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 12/28/21. (ljw, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 28:2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jerremy Raschaad Ray.(bjc, )
December 20, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerremy Raschaad Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?