Evans v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Plaintiff: Aaron Evans
Defendant: Director Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID, Lieutenant John Ellis, Sergeant Robinson, Major Ragsdale and Sergeant Henry
Case Number: 6:2022cv00187
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron Evans (gsm)
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Aaron Evans on 6/22/2022 as to #14 Order to Answer,. (gsm)
June 20, 2022 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Texas Attorney General as to #14 Order to Answer and Scheduling Order. (wea, )
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO ANSWER AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The Clerk shall terminate Director Bobby Lumpkin as a Defendant in this matter. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve the remaining Defendants, who shall have thirty (30) days from the date of such service in which to answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiff's claims against them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/16/2022. (wea, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Ellis, Sergeant Henry, Major Ragsdale, Sergeant Robinson, filed by Aaron Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope(s))(gsm)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Aaron Evans as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Received 5/24/2022. (ndc)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by General Counsel as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Received 5/26/22. (ndc)
June 1, 2022 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Aaron Evans as to #8 Order and 1983 form. Received 5/27/2022. (ndc)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Local Funds as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Received 5/24/22. (ndc)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by Aaron Evans. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint on the standard form stating specific facts to support his claim(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/20/2022. (gsm)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/20/2022. (gsm)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:22-cv-00503. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that the above-referenced case is TRANSFERRED to the Tyler Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 Case Opening Letter. (sv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 Inmate Trust Account Statement filed by Aaron Evans. (sv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Evans. (sv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Aaron Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant John Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?