Lifenet, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Lifenet, Inc., AIR METHODS CORPORATION, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC and EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Office of Personnel Management, Janet Yellen, Kiran Ahuja, Martin J Walsh and Secretary Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 6:2022cv00453
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The Court hereby grants the parties 21 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court ORDERS that these two cases are CONSOLIDATED, with Case No. 6:22-cv-450 as the lead case. All future docket entries should be made only in the lead case except for orders reflecting a final disposition.. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/12/2023. (wea, )
January 12, 2023 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:22cv450 designated as the Lead Case. All future docket entries should be made only in the lead case except for orders reflecting a final disposition. (wea, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc. NOTICE REGARDING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND TO SET A SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Shepard, Steven)
December 13, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; 8 Summonses in a Civil Action and 4 Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statements served on Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General of the U.S. on 12/5/2022, filed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; 8 Summonses in a Civil Action and 4 Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statements served on U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Texas on 12/5/2022, filed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Xavier Becerra served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Office of Personnel Management served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. U.S. Department of the Treasury served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. U.S. Department of Labor served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Martin J Walsh served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Kiran Ahuja served on 12/6/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lifenet, Inc., EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC. Janet Yellen served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Smyser, James)
December 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr on behalf of EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc. (Shackelford, Stephen)
December 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James Craig Smyser on behalf of EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9259501. (Smyser, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2022: #1 Sealed Attachment) (nkl, ).
December 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Max I Straus on behalf of EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9259451. (Straus, Max)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven M. Shepard on behalf of EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC, Lifenet, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9259223. (Shepard, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2022: #1 Sealed Attachment) (nkl, ).
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Arters on behalf of AIR METHODS CORPORATION, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9254407. (Arters, Joshua)
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David Alan King on behalf of AIR METHODS CORPORATION, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9254388. (King, David)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Office of Personnel Management, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es))(ndc)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Air Methods Corporation for Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC. (Synowicki, John)
December 2, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AIR METHODS CORPORATION (Synowicki, John)
December 2, 2022 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (gsm)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lifenet, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lifenet, Inc. for Lifenet, Inc.. (Shackelford, Stephen)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC identifying Corporate Parent for East Texas Air One, LLC for EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC. (Shackelford, Stephen)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTXEDC-9250670.), filed by Lifenet, Inc., EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shackelford, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifenet, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifenet, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr
Represented By: Max I Straus
Represented By: James Craig Smyser
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIR METHODS CORPORATION
Represented By: David Alan King
Represented By: Joshua Arters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Arters
Represented By: David Alan King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST TEXAS AIR ONE, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford, Jr
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: James Craig Smyser
Represented By: Max I Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?