James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis v. Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, et al.
Plaintiff: James A. Ellis, as Independent Executor for the Estate of Phillip Terry Ellis and the Estate of Janice Ellis and James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 and Finance of America Reverse, LLC
Case Number: 6:2023cv00138
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Filing 17 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC, Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 (Swernofsky, Rachael)
May 10, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis. (Crouch, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for defendant Finance of America Reverse, LLC to file the appropriate disclosure on or before May 17, 2023. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 5/10/2023. (ndc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support, by Finance of America Reverse, LLC, Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swernofsky, Rachael)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 COURT ORDER: The court grants #9 defendant's motion for extension of time. Defendant Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1, must respond to the complaint on or before May 10, 2023. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 5/8/2023. (ndc)
May 3, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Complaint (Non-Opposition) filed by James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis. (Crouch, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
May 2, 2023 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document: Amended Certificate of Conference re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swernofsky, Rachael).
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order COURT ORDER: By May 3, 2023, plaintiff is ordered to inform the court whether it opposes #9 motion for extension of time. If it does oppose the motion, plaintiff is ordered to submit briefing concerning its rationale by May 5, 2023. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 5/1/2023. (ndc)
April 26, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Complaint by Finance of America Reverse, LLC, Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swernofsky, Rachael)
April 19, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis. (Crouch, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2023: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (wea, ).
April 14, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 to 4/26/2023. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( wea, )
April 12, 2023 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Finance of America Reverse, LLC, Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1.( Swernofsky, Rachael).
April 11, 2023 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Finance of America Reverse, LLC, Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1.( Swernofsky, Rachael).
April 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lee Crouch on behalf of James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis (Crouch, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 to 4/11/2023. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( wea, )
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1.( Swernofsky, Rachael)
March 22, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (wea, )
March 22, 2023 COURT ORDER: The court adopts in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (wea, )
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION (AS FILED IN STATE COURT ACTION) against Finance of America Reverse, LLC, Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1, filed by James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(wea, )
March 20, 2023 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (wea, )
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 (Cronenwett, Mark)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1 from Henderson County Court, case number 277-2021CCL. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9411165), filed by Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2023: #10 Certified State Court Docket Sheet) (wea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis v. Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Ellis, as Independent Executor for the Estate of Phillip Terry Ellis and the Estate of Janice Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Ellis as Independant Representative of the Estate of Janice Ann Ellis
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Find Society, FSB, as Trustee for Finance of America Structured Securities Acquisition Trustee 2018-HB1
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Rachael Swernofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finance of America Reverse, LLC
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Rachael Swernofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?