Grimes v. Director, TDCJ-CID et al
Plaintiff: John A Grimes
Defendant: Director, TDCJ-CID, State of Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles, Unknown Holman, Warden Unknown Marshall and CO IV C. Sallee
Case Number: 6:2023cv00406
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Filing Fee: The initial fee previously assessed #9 is waived. In the event that the Plaintiff subsequently receives deposits in his inmate trust account, the agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis, provided the account exceeds $10.00, until the full fee of $350 has been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/6/2023. (wea, 6)
October 4, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by John A Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(wea, 6)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Advisory to the Court by John A Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(wea, 6)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $7.50 within 30 days. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/8/2023. (wea, 6)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for John A Grimes. (wea, 6) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2023: #1 Envelope) (wea, 6).
September 1, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Director, TDCJ-CID, Unknown Holman, Unknown Marshall, C. Sallee, State of Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles, filed by John A Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Am. Complaint, #2 Preliminary Questions, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Envelope)(wea, 6)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 Acknowledgement card returned signed re #4 Order,, Set/Clear Flags, (jbe, 6)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by John A Grimes. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint, and thirty days from the receipt of this order to either pay the $402 filing fee or submit an application to proceed IFP. Clerks office shall accept no filings from Plaintiff, other than a motion for extension of time, until he has complied with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/17/2023. (gsm)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell (jbe, 6)
August 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John A Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Account Summary)(jbe, 6)
August 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Director, TDCJ-CID, State of Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles, filed by John A Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit (Exhibit B not provided), #3 Envelope)(jbe, 6)
August 11, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent mailed to Plaintiff. (jbe, 6)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Director, TDCJ-CID et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Unknown Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO IV C. Sallee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?