Schreuders v. Tutt Tool Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clinton Schreuders
Defendant: Tutt Tool Sales, LLC and JS Products, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv00420
Filed: August 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Filing 20 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #13 First MOTION to Remand filed by Tutt Tool Sales, LLC. (Roark, Stephanie)
September 20, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 First MOTION to Remand filed by Clinton Schreuders. (Lenz, Myles)
September 20, 2023 Filing 18 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #19 FOR CORRECT DOCKET ENTRY***RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 First MOTION to Remand filed by Clinton Schreuders. (Lenz, Myles).
September 20, 2023 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 18, Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (wea, 6)
September 13, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #13 First MOTION to Remand filed by Tutt Tool Sales, LLC. (Thomas, Drew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (wea, 6).
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by JS Products, Inc. (Rossini, Murray)
September 7, 2023 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JS Products, Inc.. (Rossini, Murray)
September 7, 2023 Filing 14 JS Products, Inc.'s ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by JS Products, Inc..(Rossini, Murray)
August 31, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION to Remand by Clinton Schreuders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lenz, Myles)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Jane Roark on behalf of Tutt Tool Sales, LLC (Roark, Stephanie)
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Carlton Rook on behalf of Tutt Tool Sales, LLC (Rook, Chad)
August 31, 2023 Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT FILING. SEE ENTRY #11 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Carlton Rook on behalf of JS Products, Inc. (Rook, Chad) Modified on 8/31/2023 (gsm).
August 31, 2023 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #8 submitted by Clinton Schreuders. Incorrect docketing event. Clerk will attach the Proposed Order to #7 Motion. (wea, 6)
August 31, 2023 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Attorney Appearance submitted, Docket Entry #10 . Incorrect Party Selected. See Entry #11 for Corrected Filing.(gsm)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clinton Schreuders.(Lenz, Myles)
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Proposed Pretrial Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave by Clinton Schreuders. (Lenz, Myles).
August 30, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Clinton Schreuders. (Lenz, Myles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (wea, 6).
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 Amended Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Clinton Schreuders (Lenz, Myles).
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Clinton Schreuders (Lenz, Myles)
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Tutt Tool Sales, LLC (Thomas, Drew)
August 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Original Petition filed in State Court. (Attachments: #1 Original Answer in State Court)(gsm)
August 24, 2023 COURT ORDER: The court adopts in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (gsm)
August 23, 2023 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (gsm)
August 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Tutt Tool Sales, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Thomas, Drew)
August 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tutt Tool Sales, LLC from 4th District Court, Rusk County, case number 2023-145. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9663203), filed by Tutt Tool Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Thomas, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schreuders v. Tutt Tool Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Schreuders
Represented By: Myles Anthony Lenz
Represented By: Ramez F Shamieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutt Tool Sales, LLC
Represented By: Drew Martin Thomas
Represented By: Chad Carlton Rook
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JS Products, Inc.
Represented By: Murray Joseph Rossini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?