Garcia v. Unknown Staff et al
Plaintiff: Antonio A. Garcia
Defendant: Unknown Staff and Director FNU Parker
Case Number: 6:2023cv00585
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to label suit and inform court of relief by Antonio A. Garcia. (gsm)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Financial Data submitted by Antonio A. Garcia (Attachments: #1 IFP Financial Data)(gsm)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Antonio A. Garcia. ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either pay the statutory $402.00 filing fee, or furnish an ifp application accompanied by a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account summary sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/20/2023. (gsm)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by Antonio A. Garcia. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/20/2023. (gsm)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 MOTIONS for Discovery, and Court Appointed Attorney by Antonio A. Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wea, 6)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 MOTIONS for Confidentiality, to Remove Name from Respondent, Acceptance as Whistleblower, Appointment of Counsel, Accessibility to Courts, Indigent Certificate, Incarceration Certificate, Discovery, by Antonio A. Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wea, 6).
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love (jbe, 6)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Antonio A. Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Grievances, #2 Envelope)(jbe, 6) Modified on 12/1/2023 to correct file date (jbe, 6).
November 20, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent mailed to Plaintiff. (jbe, 6)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Unknown Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio A. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director FNU Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?