Prescott (PS) v. Hopkins et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Prescott
Defendant: Terrie Hopkins, Tanya Hudnall, Ron Steffa, Andrew C. Brazeal, Christoher D. Amegan, Lannette Litchium, Owen J Murray, Justin Robison, Joe McFarlin, David Ayala, J Thomas, Bre'Aile A. Patterson, Osugi Adebayo, Tracy L. Carter-Lewis, Esther Louis Jean Gedeon, Ivonne R. Liberty, Rebecca Douglas, Rene L Gelena and Patricia Malandono
Case Number: 6:2024cv00068
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 2 Complaint,, by Anthony Prescott. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jbe)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Further, Plaintiff must cease the practice of filing single documents bearing multiple civil action numbers. The Clerk is directed to refuse any further submissions from Plaintiff in this case that bear more than one case number. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/25/2024. (WEA)
March 18, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Prescott. (Attachments: #1 Additional Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(gsm)
March 8, 2024 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Anthony Prescott as to #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 1983/IFP. Dated 3/5/224. (ndc)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO AMEND. Plaintiff has thirty days from the receipt of this order to either pay the $405 filing fee or submit an IFP application. Further, Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint on the standard form stating specific facts to support his claim(s). Plaintiff's #3 , #6 Motions Seeking to File Medical Records Under Seal is GRANTED. Finally, Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/28/2024. (wea, 6)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:24-cv-00512. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/27/2024. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. (jrobe, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION Seeking to File #5 Attached Medical Records Under Seal, by Plaintiff Anthony Prescott. (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 5 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits by Plaintiff Anthony Prescott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION Seeking Leave to Exceed Local Rule Page Limit & Notice of Related Cases, by Plaintiff Anthony Prescott. (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION Seeking to File #1 Attached Medical Records Under Seal, by Plaintiff Anthony Prescott. (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Osugi Adebayo, Christoher D. Amegan, David Ayala, Andrew C. Brazeal, Tracy L. Carter-Lewis, Rebecca Douglas, Esther Louis Jean Gedeon, Rene L Gelena, Terrie Hopkins, Tanya Hudnall, Ivonne R. Liberty, Lannette Litchium, Patricia Malandono, Joe McFarlin, Owen J. Murray, Bre'Aile A. Patterson, Justin Robison, Ron Steffa, J. Thomas (Filing Fee: $405.00, Receipt Number: 109818), filed by Anthony Prescott. (Public Text Only Entry for #1 Restricted Document filed 02/20/2024) (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Complaint with Exhibits by Plaintiff Anthony Prescott. (blaws) Modified on 2/26/2024 to clarify docket text. (blaws) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/27/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prescott (PS) v. Hopkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Prescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrie Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Hudnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Steffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Brazeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christoher D. Amegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannette Litchium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen J Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bre'Aile A. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osugi Adebayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy L. Carter-Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Louis Jean Gedeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivonne R. Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene L Gelena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Malandono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?