Anascape, Ltd v. Microsoft Corp. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Anascape, Ltd. sued defendants Microsoft Corp. and Nintendo of America, Inc., and alleged that defendants infringed on various patents related to video game consoles and video game controllers.

Plaintiff: Anascape, Ltd
Defendant: Microsoft Corp. and Nintendo of America, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corp. and Nintendo of America, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Anascape, Ltd
Case Number: 9:2006cv00158
Filed: July 31, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Lufkin Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 REPLY to Response to 419 MOTION to Stay TAXATION OF COSTS PENDING CONCLUSION OF ANASCAPE'S ANTICIPATED APPEAL TO THE SUPREME COURT filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 8/17/2010 (leh, ).
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Heartfield, J)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 420 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goehringer, Charles)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 420 RESPONSE to 419 MOTION to Stay Taxation of Costs Pending Conclusion of Anasacape's Anticipated Appeal To The Supreme Court filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - To Be Filed Under Seal)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 8/5/2010 (leh, ).
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION to Stay TAXATION OF COSTS PENDING CONCLUSION OF ANASCAPE'S ANTICIPATED APPEAL TO THE SUPREME COURT by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 415 Proposed Bill of Costs,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H Part 1, # 3 Exhibit H Part 2, # 4 Exhibit I)(Blank, James)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 415 Proposed Bill of Costs,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C Part 2, # 2 Exhibit C Part 3, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F)(Blank, James)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 415 Proposed Bill of Costs,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B Part 4, # 2 Exhibit B Part 5, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1)(Blank, James)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Conference and Certificate of Compliance, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of J Blank, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B Part 1, # 5 Exhibit B Part 2, # 6 Exhibit B Part 3)(Blank, James)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting 413 Joint Motion to Extend. The deadline to submit any bill of costs is extended from June 29, 2010 until July 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/1/10. (ljw, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File -- Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Bill of Costs -- by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting 411 Nintendo of America, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Bill of Costs. The deadline is extended until June 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/23/10. (ljw, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER granting 408 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Anthony Matthew Garza. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on June 18, 2010. (leh, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER Re: June 17, 2010 Telephone Hearing. The court will not vacate the July 23, 2008 permanent injunction at this time. The injunction will remain in place, and it will remain stayed, pending further order of this court. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/17/10. (ljw, )
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2010. An order will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 USCA Judgment of the Federal Circuit reversing the Judgments of validity, infringement, and award of damages of the District Court. Circuit Judges: Newman, Gajarsa, and Dyk. Issued as Mandate: April 13, 2010. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion, # 2 Opinion of Circuit Judge Gajarsa)(ljw, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE of mailing 6 boxes of appeal record to U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit: 1 box of sealed documents, 1 box of transcripts, 1 box of trial exhibits, 3 boxes of appeal record (11 vols). (djh, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Request by the U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit for the Appeal record (djh, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting 402 Unopposed Motion to supplement the protective order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/24/08. (djh, )
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Consent MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER denying 400 Nintendo of America, Inc's Unopposed Motion for Radaction of Electronic Transcript. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/29/08. (djh, )
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 400 SEALED MOTION for Redaction of Electronic Transcript filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Goehringer, Charles)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by James S Blank re 395 Transcript,,,. (Blank, James)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 398 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $113,982.48. (djh, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE of Docketing ROA by USCA. Case #2008-1500 (ljw, )
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 396 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Callahan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E Part 1, # 7 Exhibit E Part 2, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Callahan, Steven)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 395 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Post-Trial Motions held on July 18, 2008 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891, CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2008. (clb, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Certified copy of Notice of Appeal and docket entries sent to US Court of Appeals. (ljw, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Royalty Payment Bond in the amount of $10,366,956.60 posted by Nintendo of America, Inc. (djh, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Supersedeas Bond in the amount of $27,699,537.68 posted by Nintendo of America, Inc. (djh, ) Modified on 7/30/2008 (djh, ).
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting 389 Unopposed motion for approval of supersedeas bond. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/08. (djh, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting 388 Unopposed motion for approval of security bond. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/08. (djh, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 389 SEALED MOTION -- Unopposed Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Supersedeas Bond)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 388 SEALED MOTION -- Unopposed Motion for Approval of Security Bond filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Royalty Payment Bond)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 354 Order on Motion for New Trial, 384 Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, 186 Order, 380 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, 242 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 182 Memorandum & Opinion by Nintendo of America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05400000000001634432. (Goehringer, Charles)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Received 1 CD containing Anascape's exhibit list for the 7/18/08 post trial hearing (djh, )
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 384 FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Pla Anascape, Ltd shall recover from the dft Nintendo of America, Inc in the sum $21,000,000 the amount of actual damages found by the jury, plus the additional amount of $2,082,739.73 as prejudgment interest for a total amount of $23,082,739.73. The judgment shall bear interest at the rate agreed upon by the parties, namely 2.21% per annum. The judgment is entered for Nintendo America, Inc and against Anascape, Ltd. on the infringement contentions as to claims 1, 5-6, 12-20 of the '525 patent and claims 1-11, 21, 26-29 and 31 of the '700 patent. Any remaining counterclaims asserted by Nintendo related to the '525 patent are dismissed without prejudice. Nintendo of America, Inc and against Anascape, Ltd. on Anascape's claim of willfulness and claim for attorney fees. Nintendop of America, Inc., its officers, agents, servants, employees and attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice are hereby restrained and enjoined pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d) and 35 USC 283 from using in the United States offering to sell in the United States, selling in the United States, or importing into the United States, either alone or in combination with any products, services or systems: i) Nintendo's Wii Classic controller, ii) Nintendo's GameCube controller, and the iii) Nintendo's GameCube Wavebird wireless controller. This injunction shall be in force until the expiration of the '700 patent; however the requirement set out in the preceding paragraph of this order of permanent injunction are stayed conditioned upon the deposit in an interest-bearing escrow account by Nintendo of America, Inc during the stay of the injunction. Proceeds shall be deposited from the sales of the foregoing products whether sold individually or bundled with another product. Nintendo of America, Inc shall place said amount into an escrow account in accordance with terms as agreed by the parties, or alternatively the court registry until part of all of the amount is released to either Anascape, Ltd. or Nintendo of America, Inc. pursuant only to a court order or an agreement of the parties. The first deposit of said escrow amount shall take place 30 days following the next calendar quarter following entry of this judgment and would be due 30 days following every calendar quarter thereafter. Along with each deposit, Nintendo of America, Inc shall provide to Anascape, Ltd. an accounting of the proceeds based on sales of Nintendo's GameCube, Wavebird Wireless, Wii Classic, and Wii Remote controllers and bundles that include those products during the previous calendar quarter. Costs are taxed against Nintendo of America, Inc. All relief not specifically granted herein is denied. All pending motions not previously ruled on are denied. All issues having been disposed of, this is a Final Judgment and is appealable. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/23/08. (djh, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Letter from Larry Germer to Judge Clark re: hearing on the 7/18/08 (djh, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Received from parties 1 CD containint the joint exhibit CD in Lufkin Ofc. (djh, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Sealed Document. Joint Notice regarding (1) Prejudgment Interest and (2) Proposed Escrow and Bond Terms. (Goehringer, Charles)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Motion Hearing held in Beaumont on 7/18/2008 re 359 SEALED PATENT MOTION ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND AN ONGOING ROYALTY filed by Anascape, Ltd, 358 SEALED MOTION -- Nintendo of America's Motion Regarding Ongoing Royalties filed filed by Nintendo of America, Inc., 360 MOTION FOR (1) PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; (2) POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND (3) COSTS MOTION FOR (1) PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; (2) POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND (3) COSTS filed by Anascape, Ltd, 355 MOTION to Sever PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER denying 356 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and denying 356 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/18/08. (ljw, )
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 379 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 378 Response to Non-Motion, --Nintendo's Response to Anascape's Objection to Improperly Disclosed Nintendo Witnesses and Witness Testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE to 365 Sealed Patent Document -- Nintendo's Response to Anascape's Objection to Improperly Disclosed Nintendo Witnesses and Witness Testimony filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting 376 Unopposed motion to allow Keith Ugone to Testify by telephone at the July 18 hearing. It is further ordered that the parties use their best efforts and be reasonable in terms of the logistics of Dr. Ugone's telephone testimony. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/15/08. (ljw, )
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Consent MOTION to Allow Keith Ugone to Testify by Telephone at the July 18 Hearing by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting 363 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sabrina Hassan terminated. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/14/08. (ljw, )
July 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 374 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 369 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 373 RESPONSE to Motion re 360 MOTION FOR (1) PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; (2) POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND (3) COSTS MOTION FOR (1) PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; (2) POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND (3) COSTS filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 372 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 369 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 2 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 3 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 4 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 5 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 6 Exhibit 20 Part 1 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 7 Exhibit 20 Part 2 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 8 Exhibit 20 Part 3 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 9 Exhibit 20 Part 4 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 10 Exhibit 20 Part 5 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 11 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 12 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 13 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 14 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 15 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 16 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 17 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris, # 18 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Robert W. Faris)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 371 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 369 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Faris Part 1, # 2 Declaration of Faris Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Faris Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Faris Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Faris Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Faris Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Faris Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Faris Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Faris Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 Part 1 to Faris Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 Part 2 to Faris Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 9 Part 3 to Faris Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Faris Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 11 Part 1 to Faris Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 11 Part 2 to Faris Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 11 Part 3 to Faris Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 11 Part 4 to Faris Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 11 Part 5 to Faris Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 11 Part 6 to Faris Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 11 Part 7 to Faris Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 11 Part 8 to Faris Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 11 Part 9 to Faris Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 11 Part 10 to Faris Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 11 Part 11 to Faris Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 12 to Faris Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 13 to Faris Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 14 to Faris Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 15 to Faris Declaration)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 370 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 369 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Clark, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Clark Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Nathan Clark, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Nathan Clark, # 5 Declaration of Charles Goehringer, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Charles Goehringer, # 7 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Charles Goehringer, # 8 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Charles Goehringer, # 9 Declaration of Akio Ikeda)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 369 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 359 SEALED PATENT MOTION ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND AN ONGOING ROYALTY filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 368 RESPONSE in Opposition re 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), or in the Alternative MOTION for New Trial filed filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. -- Notice of Change of Firm for James S. Blank filed by (Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE to Motion re 355 MOTION to Sever PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 365 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT ANASCAPE'S OBJECTION TO IMPROPERLY DISCLOSED NINTENDO WITNESSES AND WITNESS TESTIMONY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 364 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 358 SEALED MOTION -- Nintendo of America's Motion Regarding Ongoing Royalties filed filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jamie Shouse, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hassan, Sabrina)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the document 362 submitted by Nintendo of America, Inc.. Must file Text of Proposed order as attachment to motion. Correction should be made by 7/11/08 (ljw, )
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 362 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, SEE DOCUMENT 363 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENTConsent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Hassan, Sabrina) Modified on 7/11/2008 (ljw, ). Modified on 7/11/2008 (ljw, ).
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting 357 Anascape Motion to allow Kelly Tyler to testify by telephone at the 7/18 hearing. The parties are to use their best efforts and be reasonable in terms of the logistics of Mr. Tyler's telephone testimony. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/3/08. (djh, )
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MOTION FOR (1) PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; (2) POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND (3) COSTS by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 359 SEALED PATENT MOTION ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND AN ONGOING ROYALTY by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 358 SEALED MOTION -- Nintendo of America's Motion Regarding Ongoing Royalties filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bask, # 2 Declaration of Ugone, # 3 Exhibit A to Ugone Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Ugone Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Ugone Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Ugone Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Ugone Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Ugone Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Ugone Declaration, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Consent MOTION ANASCAPE, LTD.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ALLOW KELLY TYLER TO TESTIFY BY TELEPHONE AT THE JULY 18 HEARING by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), or in the Alternative, MOTION for New Trial filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION to Sever PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER denying 337 Defendants Motion for Remittitur or, in theAlternative, a New Trial on Damages. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/26/08. (ljw, )
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE of Hearing on Post-Trial Motions RESET for 7/18/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, )
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of Submission (with Certificate of Service) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Blank, James)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 337 MOTION for New Trial -- Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion for Remittitur or, in the Alternative, a New Trial on Damages filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 349 REPLY to Response to Motion re 337 MOTION for New Trial -- Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion for Remittitur or, in the Alternative, a New Trial on Damages filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Blank, James)
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 348 RESPONSE in Opposition re 337 MOTION for New Trial -- Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion for Remittitur or, in the Alternative, a New Trial on Damages filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. -- Defendant Nintendo of America Inc.'s Notice of Submission with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Blank, James)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 TRANSCRIPT of 5/1/2008 Final Pretrial Conference before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 345 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 7 of 7 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 6 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.comNOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 343 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 5. before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.comNOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 342 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 4. before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.comNOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 341 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 3, before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.comNOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 2, before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 1 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891. Email: CbickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (clb, )
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER re: replacement of hard copies of exhibits which were originally submitted but were not offered or mentioned before the jury are not part of the record. The parties shall meet and confer on the best way to produce electronic copies of exhibits that were offered and ruled admissible, which may simply require editing the disks previously provided for use at trial. Signed by Judge Judge Ron Clark on 5/21/08. (djh, ) Modified on 6/4/2008 (djh, ).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION for New Trial -- Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion for Remittitur or, in the Alternative, a New Trial on Damages by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Trial Exhibit List by Nintendo of America, Inc... (djh, )
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Trial Exhibit List by Anascape, Ltd.. (djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 333 JURY VERDICT.(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 332 SEALED Jury Note #8(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 331 SEALED Jury Note #7(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SEALED Jury Note #6(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 329 SEALED Jury Note #5(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SEALED Jury Note #4(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED Jury Note #3(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 SEALED Jury Note #2(djh, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 325 SEALED Jury Note #1(djh, )
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Received 1 CD containing preliminary trial exhibits that were admitted from Anascape. Parties will file the agreed CD with exhibits at a later date (djh, ) Modified on 6/12/2008 (djh, ).
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day Seven of Jury Trial completed on 5/14/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day seven) (djh, ).
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Jury Instructions filed. (djh, )
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day Six Jury Trial held on 5/13/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day six) (djh, ). Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ).
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day Five of Jury Trial held on 5/12/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day five) (djh, ). Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ).
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law with Certificate of Service by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day Four of Jury Trial held on 5/8/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day four) (djh, ). Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ).
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day Three of Jury Trial held on 5/7/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day three) (djh, ). Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ).
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day Two Jury Trial held on 5/6/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day two) (djh, ). Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ).
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Sealed Joint Motion for Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice (djh, )
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER denying as moot 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/6/08. (djh, )
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Day One of Jury Trial held on 5/5/2008 in Lufkin, Tx (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (djh, ) Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 1 day one) (djh, ). Modified on 5/20/2008 (djh, ).
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER on dfts' objections to pla's trial exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/08. (djh, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER on Dfts' objections and counterdesignations to pla's deposition designations. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/08. (djh, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER on Anascape's supplemental objections to Dfts' deposition designations. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/0. (djh, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 310 AMENDED ORDER on Anascape's objections to dfts' trial exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/08. (djh, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER on Objections to deposition designations. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/08. (djh, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd NOTICE OF SUBMISSIONS (Cawley, Douglas)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd PLAINTIFF ANASCAPE, LTD.'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Cawley, Douglas)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Final Pretrial Conference held in Beaumont on 5/1/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER on Anascape's 281 Objections to dfts' trial exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 305 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 263 Sealed Dfts' motion in limine. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 264 Pla's Sealed Patent Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying 217 Sealed Dft's Joint Objections, Motion and Supporting Memorandum to exclude the expert testimony of Robert Howe as Legally Flawed. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting 209 Pla's Motion to strike portions of the expert reports of Stephen Bristow and Rober Dezmelyk and denying 226 Sealed Patent Motion leave to amend their invalidity contentions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, )
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd NOTICE OF SUBMISSION (Cawley, Douglas)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting 294 Joint motion for court approval of Japanese Interpreters Jared Taylor and Wray Wade. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/29/08. (djh, )
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. --Notice of Filing Letter Brief Requesting Clarification or Additional Claim Construction of the '700 Patent Claim Terms -- filed by (Goehringer, Charles)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying 212 Joint Motion to Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions as Inadmissible Under FRE 702. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/28/08. (ljw, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 211 Motion Objections and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Mark Baldwin. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/28/08. (ljw, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Joint MOTION for Court Approval of Interpreters by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Blank, James)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Microsoft Corporation's Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Toddy, Derrick)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. -- Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Procedures filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. -- (Goehringer, Charles)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Mozola Shouse on behalf of Anascape, Ltd (Shouse, Jamie)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Filing Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File a Motion to Strike New Expert Testimony of Anascape's Damages Expert, Walter Bratic (Toddy, Derrick)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 225 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U S Patent No. 6,906,700. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/25/08. (djh, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Sealed Document. Nintendo's Response to Anascape's Objections to Nintendo's Deposition Designations, with Certificate of Service and Certificate of Compliance with Local Civil Rule 5(a)(7). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blank, James)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 226 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 225 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,906,700 filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Proposed Findings of Fact by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 284 BRIEF filed DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF [DKT 283] CERTAIN GROUPS OF SIMILAR OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL EXHIBITS by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Carraway, J)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL EXHIBITS (Carraway, J)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2, Part A# 3 Exhibit 2, Part B# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd ANASCAPE'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' TRIAL EXHIBITS (Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 280 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 263 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine, with Certificate of Service and Certificate of Compliance and Authority to File Under Seal filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 279 RESPONSE to 272 Response to Non-Motion -- Defendants' Joint Response to Anascape, Ltd.'s Objection to Defendants' Notices of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review, with Certificate of Service by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Proposed Findings of Fact by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on the Issue of Unenforceability of the '525 and '700 Patents Due to Inequitable Conduct)(Blank, James)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc., Anascape, Ltd PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORMS (Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Proposed Jury Instructions by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc., Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Proposed Jury Instructions by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc., Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER RE: Presenting Witnesses. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/18/08. (djh, )
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER denying as moot 266 Motion for Leave to File attachments in Hard copy. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/16/08. (djh, )
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESPONSE to 271 Notice (Other), 269 Notice (Other) ANASCAPE, LTD.'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICES OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW by Anascape, Ltd. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. re 258 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Submission of Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Documents for In Camera Review (Carraway, J)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 263 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine, with Certificate of Service and Certificate of Compliance and Authority to File Under Seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2A# 3 Exhibit 2B# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17)(Blank, James)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of Submission of Defendant Nintendo of America, Inc.'s Documents for In Camera Review, with Certificate of Service (Blank, James)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER DENYING as moot 259 Motion for Leave to File; granting 260 Motion for Leave to File. The pla is allowed up to 8 pages for its Sur-Reply to dfts' reply. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/11/08. (djh, )
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Objections and Counterdesignations to Anascape's Initial Designations (Toddy, Derrick)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Leave to File Attachments in Hard Copy (Unopposed) by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Attachments in Hard Copy)(Blank, James)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2008 (djh, ).
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine, with Certificate of Service and Certificate of Compliance and Authority to File Under Seal by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motions in Limine# 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine)(Blank, James)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE in Support re 226 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) filed by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Richard D. Mc Leod# 2 Exhibit 12)(Toddy, Derrick)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Received 8 binders (in 2 boxes 5 and 3) containing copies of the expert reports of Microsoft's experts Stephen Bristow, Edward G. Fiorito, and Christopher A. Martinez sent to U S District Clerk's Office-Lufkin by Microsoft atty's. (djh, )
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) -- with accompanying Certificate of Conference and Text of Proposed Order by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, with accompanying Certificate of Conference and Text of Proposed Order by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 225 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,906,700 filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Certificate of Service# 5 Certificate of Compliance and Authority to File Under Seal)(Blank, James)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Received from Nintendo 3 binder's containing copies of the expert reports of Nintendo's experts Robert Dezmelyk and Keith Ugone. These experts were not deposed by Anascape and, therefore, the binders do not contain deposition transcripts (djh, )
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 217 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION , Objections and Supporting Memorandum to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Robert Howe as Legally Flawed filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc. Notice of Defendants Microsoft and Nintendo First Deposition Designations (Toddy, Derrick)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc. Notice of Service of Defendants' Identification of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Toddy, Derrick)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Cawley, Douglas)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 225 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,906,700 filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Callahan# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R# 20 Exhibit S# 21 Exhibit T# 22 Exhibit U# 23 Exhibit V# 24 Exhibit W# 25 Exhibit X# 26 Exhibit Y# 27 Exhibit Z# 28 Exhibit AA# 29 Exhibit BB# 30 Exhibit CC# 31 Exhibit DD# 32 Exhibit EE# 33 Exhibit FF# 34 Exhibit GG# 35 Exhibit HH# 36 Exhibit II# 37 Exhibit JJ# 38 Exhibit KK# 39 Exhibit LL# 40 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re 226 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Baxter, Samuel) Additional attachment(s)(Certificate of Authorization to Seal) added on 4/3/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 4/3/2008 (ch, ).
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702, 211 Joint MOTION Defendants' Objections and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Mark Baldwin and Memorandum In Support filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 223 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/31/08. (djh, )
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 209 SEALED PATENT MOTION ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF STEPHEN BRISTOW AND ROBERT DEZMELYK, 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Stephen Bristow and Robert Dezmelyk jointly filed by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Toddy, Derrick)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 223 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of All Asserted Claims of the '525 Patent and Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claims 1-11, 21, 26-29 and 31 of the '700 filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd ANASCAPE LTD.'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER CERTIFIED RECORDS (Baxter, Samuel)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Of Intent To Offer Certified Records. (McLeod, Richard)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Thor Bovenkamp on behalf of Anascape, Ltd (Bovenkamp, Christopher) Modified on 3/31/2008 (djh, ). Modified on 4/1/2008 (djh, ).
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SEALED REPLY In Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony by Robert Howe re 217 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION , Objections and Supporting Memorandum to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Robert Howe as Legally Flawed filed by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Jakubek, Joseph)
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER denying 202 Sealed Motion; denying 203 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 205 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 239 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/27/08. (djh, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 233 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/25/08. (djh, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 202 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent 6,906,700, 203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of "3-D Graphics Controller" Claims filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 47# 2 Exhibit 48# 3 Exhibit 49# 4 Exhibit 50# 5 Exhibit 51# 6 Exhibit 52# 7 Exhibit 53# 8 Exhibit 54# 9 Exhibit 55# 10 Exhibit 56# 11 Exhibit 57)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 RESPONSE in Support re 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702 Defendants Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions as Inadmissible under FRE 702 filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Joncus, Stephen)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 237 REPLY to Response to Motion re 211 Joint MOTION Defendants' Objections and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Mark Baldwin and Memorandum In Support filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Vandenberg, John)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 205 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 19-20, 22-23 of the '700 Patent ANASCAPE, LTD'S AMENDED SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 19-20, 22-23 OF THE '700 PATENT [DKT. NO. 205] filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38# 2 Exhibit 39# 3 Exhibit 40# 4 Exhibit 41# 5 Exhibit 42# 6 Exhibit 43# 7 Exhibit 44# 8 Exhibit 45# 9 Exhibit 46)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Stephen Bristow and Robert Dezmelyk filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L# 2 Exhibit M)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re 202 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent 6,906,700 by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Dezmelyk# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B Part 1# 5 Exhibit B Part 2# 6 Exhibit B Part 3# 7 Exhibit B Part 4# 8 Exhibit C Part 1# 9 Exhibit C Part 2# 10 Exhibit C Part 3# 11 Exhibit C Part 4# 12 Exhibit D# 13 Exhibit E# 14 Exhibit F# 15 Exhibit G# 16 Exhibit H# 17 Exhibit I filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. Modified on 3/20/2008 (djh, ).
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Unopposed Motion To Extend Time For Expert Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 205 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 19-20, 22-23 of the '700 Patent filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38# 2 Exhibit 39# 3 Exhibit 40# 4 Exhibit 41# 5 Exhibit 42# 6 Exhibit 43# 7 Exhibit 44# 8 Exhibit 45# 9 Exhibit 46)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702, 211 Joint MOTION Defendants' Objections and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Mark Baldwin and Memorandum In Support filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re 217 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION , Objections and Supporting Memorandum to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Robert Howe as Legally Flawed filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of "3-D Graphics Controller" Claims filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Vandenberg, John)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Stephen Bristow and Robert Dezmelyk by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Mc Leod Declaration# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Proposed Order)(Jakubek, Joseph)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REPLY to Response to Motion re 205 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 19-20, 22-23 of the '700 Patent filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit John D. Vandenberg# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3)(Vandenberg, John)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-6(b), or, in the Alternative, Under P.R. 3-6(a) by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B - part 1 of 2# 3 Appendix B - part 2 of 2# 4 McLeod Declaration# 5 Exhibit 1# 6 Exhibit 2# 7 Exhibit 3# 8 Exhibit 4# 9 Exhibit 5# 10 Exhibit 6# 11 Exhibit 7# 12 Exhibit 8# 13 Exhibit 9# 14 Exhibit 10# 15 Exhibit 11# 16 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,906,700 by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 8# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER on letter briefs that pla's request may become moot. Pla's Letter Br., p2 n 3. Leave to file this motion is DENIED. There is an indication that dfts may wish to file four other motions for summary judgment (other than one related to a stipulation). Since no basis has been submitted, leave is DENIED as to any other summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/14/08. (djh, )
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of All Asserted Claims of the '525 Patent and Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claims 1-11, 21, 26-29 and 31 of the '700 Patent by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 202 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent 6,906,700, 205 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 19-20, 22-23 of the '700 Patent, 203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of "3-D Graphics Controller" Claims filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37# 38 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Anascape, Ltd (Cawley, Douglas)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER on limitations of trial time: Pla has 23 hours and dft Microsoft has 14 hrs and dft Nintendo has 14 hours to present their respective case at trial. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/6/08. (djh, )
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER that the Court finds it necessary to implement procedures applying to future motions to be submitted in this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/6/08. (djh, )
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION , Objections and Supporting Memorandum to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Robert Howe as Legally Flawed by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Fogerty Declaration# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2 - part 1# 4 Exhibit 2 - part 2# 5 Exhibit 2 - part 3# 6 Exhibit 3# 7 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 213 MOTION re 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702 Declaration of Ashley Fogerty In Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Fogerty Declaration)(Heartfield, J)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Additional Attachments to Main Document: PROPOSED ORDER for 211 Joint MOTION Defendants' Objections and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Mark Baldwin and Memorandum In Support.. (Vandenberg, John) Modified on 3/4/2008 (djh, ).
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PLEASE IGNORE-ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT 212 -PROPOSED ORDER THAT GOES WITH 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702Proposed Order< by Microsoft Corp.. (Joncus, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2008 (djh, ).
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Additional attachments to main document: 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702 Declaration of Ashley Fogerty In Support by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Joncus, Stephen) Modified on 3/31/2008 (djh, ).
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Joint MOTION Exclude Portions of Walter Bratic's Opinions As Admissible Under FRE 702 by Microsoft Corp.. (Joncus, Stephen) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2008 (djh, ).
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Joint MOTION Defendants' Objections and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Mark Baldwin and Memorandum In Support by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Marla Beier# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5)(Vandenberg, John)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of Compliance (Blank, James)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED PATENT MOTION ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF STEPHEN BRISTOW AND ROBERT DEZMELYK by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Part 1# 6 Exhibit E Part 2# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Compliance re: Estimate of Time Required to Complete the Presentation of Testimony (Heartfield, J)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Of PTO Communication Regarding Request For Re-examination of U.S. Patent No. 6,351,205 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McLeod, Richard)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. re 193 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 200 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF JOINT PROPOSED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 19-20, 22-23 of the '700 Patent by Microsoft Corp..Responses due by 3/10/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 19-20, 22-23, of the '700 patent# 2 Affidavit of Stephen Bristow# 3 Affidavit of Ashley Fogerty# 4 Appendix Vol. 1 of 4# 5 Appendix Vol. 2 of 4# 6 Appendix Vol. 3 of 4# 7 Appendix Vol. 4 of 4)(Vandenberg, John)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of "3-D Graphics Controller" Claims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Fogerty Affidavit)(Heartfield, J)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of "3-D Graphics Controller" Claims by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Pro Order# 2 Affidavit of Bristow# 3 Exhibit A to Bristow's Affidavit# 4 Affidavit of Fogerty# 5 Exhibit 1 to Fogerty Affidavit# 6 Exhibit 2 to Fogerty Affidavit# 7 Exhibit 3 to Forgerty Affidavit)(Vandenberg, John)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent 6,906,700 by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Dezmelyk# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B Part 1# 5 Exhibit B Part 2# 6 Exhibit B Part 3# 7 Exhibit B Part 4# 8 Exhibit C Part 1# 9 Exhibit C Part 2# 10 Exhibit C Part 3# 11 Exhibit C Part 4# 12 Exhibit D# 13 Exhibit E# 14 Exhibit F# 15 Exhibit G# 16 Exhibit H# 17 Exhibit I)(Goehringer, Charles)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SETTLEMENT AND LICENSE AGREEMENTS FROM DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORP. Opposing Motion to Compel filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a# 2 Exhibit B)(Carraway, J)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time for Deposition of David Judson. The Court extends the fact discovery deadline for the sole purpose of deposing David Judson. The specific deadline for David Judson's deposition shall be submitted as part of the proposed amended scheduling order due by Friday, February 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/22/08. (kjr, )
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SETTLEMENT AND LICENSE AGREEMENTS FROM DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORP. filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N# 2 Exhibit O# 3 Exhibit P# 4 Exhibit Q# 5 Exhibit R# 6 Exhibit S# 7 Exhibit T# 8 Exhibit U# 9 Exhibit V)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SETTLEMENT AND LICENSE AGREEMENTS FROM DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORP. filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Carraway, J)
February 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Anascape, Ltd (Callahan, Steven)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for the Deposition of David Judson by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of PTO Communications Regarding Requests for Re-Examination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,563,415 and 5,999,084 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(McLeod, Richard)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER that the final pretrial is scheduled for 5/1/08 with jury selection and trial set on 5/5/08 at 10:30 am. FURTHER ORDERED that on 3/3/08 at 4:00 pm the parties shall each submit to the count an estimate of the time that party needs to complete the presentation of testimony in this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/14/08. (djh, )
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 189 Motion to extend deadlines related to the PSVC Patents. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/14/08. (djh, )
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Disclosure by Anascape, Ltd ANASCAPE, LTD.'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS AND SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of Service of Expert Reports of Robert Dezmelyk and Edward Fiorito (with certificate of service) (Blank, James)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Of Service Of Expert Reports Of Stephen Bristow and Edward Fiorito (McLeod, Richard)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 169 Scheduling Order UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES RELATED TO THE PSVC PATENTS by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SETTLEMENT AND LICENSE AGREEMENTS FROM DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORP. by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER that the jury shall be instructed in accordance with the court's interpretations of the disputed claim terms inthe '525 and '700 patents. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/4/08. (djh, )
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER that the jury shall be instructed in accordance with the court's interpretations of the disputed claim terms in the '525 and the '700 patents. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/2/08. (djh, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of PSVC Claims filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RESPONSE in Support re 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of PSVC Claims filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Joncus, Stephen)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of PSVC Claims filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER construing claim terms of U S Patent Nos. 6,222,525 and 6,906,700 - Part I. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/11/08. (djh, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/8/08. (djh, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/8/08. (djh, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of PSVC Claims UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES RELATED TO MICROSOFT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FACT DISCOVERY by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 172 Motion to Amend/Correct. AMENDED ORDER granting Anascape's Unopposed Motion to Take Depositions in Japan. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/27/07. (kjr, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of PSVC Claims by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart Yaniger# 2 Declaration of Andrew Tesnakis# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency (no certificate of service) regarding the 173 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment submitted by Microsoft Corp. Document must be refiled. (Also note that supporting documents can be filed as attachments to main document.) (kjr, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 173 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Noninfringement of PSVC Claims Declaration of ANDREW TESNAKIS filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Joncus, Stephen)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 173 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Noninfringement of PSVC Claims Declaration of STUART YANIGER filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Joncus, Stephen)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 **Document deficient (no certificate of service). Motion terminated.** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Noninfringement of PSVC Claims by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen) Modified on 12/26/2007 (kjr, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 150 Order on Motion to Take Deposition by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John D Vandenberg for Microsoft Corporation. (receipt 9-1-789 $25) (djh, ) Modified on 12/26/2007 (kjr, ).
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd PLAINTIFF ANASCAPE'S NOTICE OF PTO NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE EX PARTE REEXAMINATION CERTIFICATE IN MICROSOFT'S REQUEST FOR REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,102,802 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: setting case specific deadlines, including docket call and final pretrial on 2/2/09 at 9:00 am and jury selection and trial on 2/9/09 at 9:00 am. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/17/07. (djh, )
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE to 162 Sealed Patent Document ANASCAPE, LTD.'S THIRD AMENDED REPLY TO MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Anascape, Ltd. (Baxter, Samuel)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 166 Notice (Other).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order ***WRONG EXHIBIT ATTACHED--Exhibit deleted and will refiled as additional attachment. Document # 166, Proposed Scheduling Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (djh, )
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of 12-11-2007 Telephone Conference. CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com 409-654-2891 (Christina Bickham)
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting 163 Motion to Amend/Correct. Entered by Judge Ron Clark on 12/11/07. (fal, )
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Telephone Conference held in Beaumont on 12/12/2007. The Court orally granted Motion to Amend/Correct [#163] and will enter a revised Scheduling Order. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 156 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, the Scheduling Order and Continue the March 2008 Trial Date by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SEALED SECOND AMENDED ANSWER, DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Carraway, J)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 158 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Second Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/30/07. (kjr, )
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER ON AGREED TERMS. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/30/07. (kjr, )
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIM TERMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 5,999,084; 6,102,802; 6,135,886; AND 6,343,991. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/30/07. (kjr, )
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Second Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Of PTO Order And Patent Claim Rejections In Microsoft's Request For Re-examination Of U.S. Patent No. 6,135,886 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McLeod, Richard)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting case-specific deadlines, including 3/18/08 trial as docket call and final pretrial at 9:00 am on 3/17/08; date parties should be prepared to try case as 3/17/08; 9:00 am jury selection and trial on 3/18/08, and for 5/12/08 trial as docket call and final pretrial at 9:00 am on 5/5/08; date parties should be prepared to try case as 5/5/08; jury selection and trial at 9:00 am on 5/12/08. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/8/07. (kjr, )
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Second Amended Scheduling Order)(Toddy, Derrick)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/18/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, )
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, )
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying as moot 149 Sealed Patent Motion, denying as moot 151 Motion for Extension of Time to File . Signed by Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/5/07. (djh, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of All Relevant Information in the Control of Defendant Nintendo of America Inc. by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 148 Motion to Take Deposition in Japan on 1/23/08 and ending on 1/25/08. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/30/07. (djh, )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALL RELEVANT INFORMATION IN THE CONTROL OF DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA, INC. by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Consent MOTION to Take Deposition UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION IN JAPAN by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of PTO Orders in Microsoft's Request for Reexamination of Anascape Patents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Joncus, Stephen)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 143 Motion to Extend Deadlines . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/28/07. (kjr, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of 9/19/2007 Claim Construction Hearing, Part 2. CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com (409) 654-2891 (Christina Bickham)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. -- Statement of Supplemental Authority of Nintendo of America Inc. and Microsoft Corp. (Blank, James)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp. Notice of Manual Filing - Exhibit 1 (Toddy, Derrick)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Compliance re: Technical Advisor's Fee (Heartfield, J)
September 1, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of 8/22/2007 Claim Construction Hearing, Part 1, 113 pages. CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com (409) 654-2891 (Christina Bickham)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE to 137 Notice (Other) RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Anascape, Ltd. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Supplemental Authority (Joncus, Stephen)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Excerpt, Definition of "One of Skill in the Art". 5 pages CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com, 409-654-2891 (Christina Bickham)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Markman Hearing held in Beaumont on 8/22/2007. The Court will enter a Claim Construction Order. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Anascape, Ltd (Cassady, Jason)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying 123 Motion to Stay, denying 125 Motion to Stay, finding as moot 129 Motion to Expedite, finding as moot 130 Motion to Expedite . Entered by Judge Ron Clark on 8/7/2007. (fal, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2007 re 129 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Microsoft's Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination In Light Of Patent Office Rejections Of Anascape?s Claims (Docket No. 123) filed by Microsoft Corp.,, 123 MOTION to Stay - Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination in Light of Patent Office Rejections of Anascape's Claims filed by Microsoft Corp.,, 125 MOTION to Stay -- Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Re-examination of the Remaining Patents-In-Suit filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.,, 130 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Nintendo's Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Remaining Patents-In-Suit filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.,. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re 123 MOTION to Stay - Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination in Light of Patent Office Rejections of Anascape's Claims, 125 MOTION to Stay -- Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Re-examination of the Remaining Patents-In-Suit filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of PTO Order in Nintendo's Requests for Re-Examination of Anascape Patents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blank, James)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Nintendo's Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Remaining Patents-In-Suit by Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Blank, James) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2007 (djh, ).
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Microsoft's Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination In Light Of Patent Office Rejections Of Anascape?s Claims (Docket No. 123) by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. re 123 MOTION to Stay - Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination in Light of Patent Office Rejections of Anascape's Claims -- Notice of Errata for Docket No. 123 (Attachments: # 1 Errata -Corrected Docket No. 123)(Carraway, J)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc., Anascape, Ltd re 100 Order, Second Revised Claim Construction Statement Reducing Number of Terms for Construction (Carraway, J)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 125 MOTION to Stay -- Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Re-examination of the Remaining Patents-In-Suit / [Declaration of James S. Blank] filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Blank, James)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to Stay -- Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Re-examination of the Remaining Patents-In-Suit by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 123 MOTION to Stay - Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination in Light of Patent Office Rejections of Anascape's Claims - Declaration of J. Christopher Carraway filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Carraway, J)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION to Stay - Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination in Light of Patent Office Rejections of Anascape's Claims by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. OF PTO ORDERS IN MICROSOFT?S REQUESTS FOR RE-EXAMINATION OF ANASCAPE PATENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '886 Patent Reexamination Order# 2 Exhibit B - '303 Patent Reexamination Order# 3 Exhibit C - '271 Patent Reexamination Order)(Carraway, J)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of PTO Orders and Patent Claim Rejections in Microsoft's Requests for Re-Examination of Anascape Patents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Joncus, Stephen)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim by Anascape, Ltd.(Baxter, Samuel)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim by Anascape, Ltd.(Baxter, Samuel)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Defendant Nintendo of America Inc.'s First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF PTO ORDERS AND PATENT CLAIM REJECTIONS IN MICROSOFT'S REQUESTS FOR RE-EXAMINATION OF ANASCAPE PATENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Joncus, Stephen)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Nintendo may file the amended pleadings that was attached as Exhibit 1 to the Motion. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/17/07. (kjr, )
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Consent MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Pleading# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Carraway, J)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 111 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Microsoft may file the amended pleading that was attached as Exhibit 1 to the Motion. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/9/07. (kjr, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 107 Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge Keith F. Giblin on 7/9/07. (kjr, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Pleading# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 109 Declaration of James S. Blank - Exhibit 2, filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Blank, James)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 107 Consent MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF THE HOWARD CHENG NOTEBOOK FROM DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA, INC. -- Declaration of James S. Blank filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Certificate of Service for Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel and Declaration of James S. Blank)(Blank, James)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 Consent MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF THE HOWARD CHENG NOTEBOOK FROM DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPPOSED MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF ANASCAPE, LTD.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF THE HOWARD CHENG NOTEBOOK FROM DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA, INC. by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 6/19/2007 (djh, ).
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Sumission of Technology Synopsis (Joncus, Stephen)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of Submission of Technology Synopsis of Nintendo of America Inc. and Microsoft Corp. (with Certificate of Service) (Blank, James)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANASCAPE'S CORRECTED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF- PART 1CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF - PART IICLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ANASCAPE'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF - PART 1CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Dr. Howard K. Schmidt, Executive Director, Carbon Nanotechnology Laboratory, Rice University -- MS 100, 6100 South Main Street, Houston, TX 77005, is appointed as a technical advisor to the court. Fees of the technical advisor shall be taxed, as they are incurred, equally against the parties as costs of court. The parties shall deliver copies of their preliminary proposed claim construction, the joint claim construction pre-hearing statement, the claim construction briefs and the technology synopsis to Dr. Schmidt when they are served on the opposing party. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/31/07. (kjr, )
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that the parties are to confer by July 13, 2007 and determine which additional claim terms can be agreed upon, and which are unclear or ambiguous terms or words of art, which are actually in dispute and require construction by the court. The parties shall notify the court of any new agreements on claim terms by 4:00 P.M. on August 1. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/31/07. (kjr, )
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Technology Tutorials. The time is extended to 6/8/07. No other deadlines are affected by this Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/31/07. (kjr, )
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Technology Tutorials by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 95 Claim Construction Brief, 96 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit 3# 2 Corrected Exhibit 4# 3 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 95 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3 - Part One# 4 Exhibit 3 - Part Two# 5 Exhibit 4 - Part One# 6 Exhibit 4 - Part Two# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7 - Part One# 10 Exhibit 7 - Part Two# 11 Exhibit 8# 12 Exhibit 9# 13 Exhibit 10# 14 Exhibit 11# 15 Exhibit 12# 16 Exhibit 13# 17 Exhibit 14# 18 Exhibit 15# 19 Exhibit 16# 20 Exhibit 17# 21 Exhibit 18# 22 Exhibit 19# 23 Exhibit 20# 24 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Regarding Exhibits)(Blank, James)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MICROSOFT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS PROPOSED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR THE PATENTS ASSERTED AGAINST BOTH MICROSOFT AND NINTENDO filed by Microsoft Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14)(Jakubek, Joseph)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Carraway, J)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that the Court considering appointing Dr. Howard K. Schmidt, Execuitive Director, Caron Nanotechnology Laboratory, Rice Unversity, as technical advisor to the Court. Technical advisor fees will be taxed equally among the parties as costs of court. The parties have until 5/16/07 to file any objections under sealed and in camera to this appointment.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/10/07. (djh, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs and Technology Tutorials. The Court's December 20, 2006 Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Responsive Claim Construction Briefs by May 21, 2007; Reply Claim Construction Briefs by June 1, 2007; Submit Technology Synopsis June 1, 2007. No other deadlines are affected by this Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/7/07. (kjr, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS AND TECHNOLOGY TUTORIALS by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed.ANASCAPE'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF - PART II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed.ANASCAPE OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF - PART 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Stay. The litigation is stayed with respectto United States Patent Nos. 6,208,271, 6,347,997, 6,400,303. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/07. (kjr, )
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc., Anascape, Ltd re 82 Telephone Conference - Revised Joint Claim Construction Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Microsoft-Only Patents# 2 Exhibit 2 - Microsoft & Nintendo Patents)(Carraway, J)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Stay by Anascape Ltd. and by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd JOINT REPORT REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF A TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence Louis Germer (Germer, Lawrence)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2007. Within 2 weeks the parties shall meet and confer. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (bca, )
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 4/17/2007 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. (bca, )
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER governing Markman Hearing. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/29/07. (djh, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 BRIEF filed JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 76 Motion to amend scheduling order. Deadline amended: March 16, 2007 Parties to exchange preliminary proposed claim construction and extrinsic evidence supporting same (P.R. 4-2). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/28/07. (kjr, )
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. OF PTO ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR RE-EXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,999,084 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PTO ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR RE-EXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,999,084)(Carraway, J)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Joint MOTION To Amend The Scheduling Order by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, J)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 , 60 Motion to Stay. The Motions to Stay are GRANTED as to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,344,791, 6,351,205 and 6,563,415 and DENIED as to the remaining patents. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/23/07. (kjr, )
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 (Approved) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sabrina Hassan for Nintendo of America, Inc. (fees paid). (kjr, )
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Disclosure by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Germer, Lawrence)
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. (Jakubek, Joseph)
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 60 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending PTO Reexamination of the Asserted Patents, 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: May 25, 2007 Submit Technology Synopsis. All other deadlines and requirements remain unchanged and are governed by the originalScheduling Order [Doc. #52]. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/9/07. (kjr, )
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff is allowed up to 10 pages for its consolidated sur-reply. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/9/07. (kjr, )
February 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motions to Stay UNOPPOSED by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
February 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. of Certificate of Service (Blank, James)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending PTO Reexamination of the Asserted Patents filed by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Blank, James)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. that Requests for Reexamination Have Been Filed in the United States Patent and Trademark Office (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Blank, James)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph T. Jakubek# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Carraway, J)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. that Requests for Reexamination Of All Twelve Patents-In-Suit Have Been Filed in the PTO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12)(Jakubek, Joseph)
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 60 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending PTO Reexamination of the Asserted Patents, 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency (wrong pdf attached) regarding the 61 Reply to 60 Motion submitted by Anascape, Ltd. Document will be refiled. (kjr, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 **Please ignore. Wrong pdf attached. Document refiled at 62 .**SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 60 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending PTO Reexamination of the Asserted Patents, 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/31/2007 (kjr, ).
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending PTO Reexamination of the Asserted Patents by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Proposed Order re 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office - (Carraway, J) Modified on 1/17/2007 (kjr, ).
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office - Declaration of J. Christopher Carraway filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26)(Carraway, J)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office - Declaration of Marc Whitten filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Carraway, J)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office by Microsoft Corp.. (Carraway, J)
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 (Approved) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jared S Goff for Microsoft Corp. (kjr, )
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Jared S. Goff; Fee: $25, receipt number: 9-1-535 (kjr, )
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Matthew Garza on behalf of Anascape, Ltd (Garza, Anthony)
December 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on 12/13/06 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham (76 pages). (kjr, )
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER setting case-specific deadlines, including possible tutorial at 10:00 am on 8/20/07. Deadlines for 3/3/08 trial, including docket call and final pretrial at 9:00 am on 3/3/08; date parties should be prepared to try case as 3/3/08; jury selection/trial at 9:00 am on 3/10/08. Deadlines for 5/12/08 trial, including docket call and final pretrial at 9:00 am on 5/5/08; date parties should be prepared to try case as 5/5/08; jury selection/trial at 9:00 am on 5/12/08. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/20/06. (kjr, )
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to Ninento's Counterclaim by Anascape, Ltd.(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 12/15/2006 (kjr, ).
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to Microsoft's Counterclaim by Anascape, Ltd.(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 12/15/2006 (kjr, ).
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Case Management Conference held in Beaumont on 12/13/2006. The Court will enter a scheduling order. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (bca, )
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 46 Response to Non-Motion.. (Goehringer, Charles)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. re 11 Notice (Other) - Microsoft's Response to Anascape's Proposed Patent Grouping (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from Plaintiff to Defendants)(Carraway, J)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE to 11 Notice (Other) Nintendo's Supplemental Response to Anascape's Proposed Grouping of Patents by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Goehringer, Charles)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Microsoft's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Carraway, J)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint OF ANASCAPE, LTD., COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Nintendo of America, Inc..(Goehringer, Charles)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/5/06. (kjr, )
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by all parties by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order - Agreed Protective Order)(Carraway, J)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton Edward Dark, Jr on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (Dark, Clayton)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc., filed by Anascape, Ltd.(kjr, )
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for leave to file and serve a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/21/06. (kjr, )
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REFERRAL ORDER. Discovery disputes and discovery motions, as well as certain other motions filed in this case, shall be REFERRED, at the discretion of, or in the absence of, the undersigned, to United States Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/8/06. (kjr, )
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bunt, Robert)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Counterclaim ANASCAPE, LTD.'S REPLY TO NINTENDO OF AMERICA, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Anascape, Ltd.(Baxter, Samuel)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Counterclaim ANASCAPE, LTD.'S REPLY TO MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Anascape, Ltd.(Baxter, Samuel)
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Stephen Joncus; Fee: $25, receipt number: 9-1-493 (djh, )
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen J Joncus for Microsoft (djh, ) Modified on 12/10/2007 (kjr, ).
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd, Anascape, Ltd, Anascape, Ltd, Anascape, Ltd by Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Carraway, J)
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER to Original 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Germer, Lawrence)
October 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/5/06. (kjr, )
October 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is set for a Rule 16 Management Conference on 12/13/06 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 2 in Beaumont, Texas. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/5/06. (kjr, )
October 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims. The time is extended to 11/6/06 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/12/06. (kjr, )
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles W Goehringer, Jr on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard David McLeod on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (McLeod, Richard)
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Approved) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen P McGrath for Microsoft Corp. (kjr, )
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Approved) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Derrick W Toddy for Microsoft Corp. (kjr, )
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Robert W. Faris; Fee: $25, receipt number: 9-1-461 (kjr, )
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Approved) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert W Faris for Nintendo of America, Inc. (kjr, )
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Christopher Carraway; Fee: $25, receipt number: 9-1-458 (djh, )
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Christopher Carraway for Microsoft Corp.. (djh, )
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Joseph T Jakubek; Fee: $25, receipt number: 9-1-457 (djh, )
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph T Jakubek for Microsoft Corp.. (djh, )
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Nintendo of America, Inc. re 11 Notice (Other) Response to Anascape's Proposed Grouping of Patents (Germer, Lawrence)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. identifying Nintendo Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Germer, Lawrence)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendant Nintendo of America Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Nintendo of America, Inc..(Germer, Lawrence)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Magistrate Consent Form emailed to Microsoft Corp. (kjr, )
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corp. (Heartfield, J)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Anascape, Ltd by Microsoft Corp..(Heartfield, J)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Joseph Presta; Fee: $25, receipt number: 9-1-445 (djh, )
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph S Presta for Nintendo of America, Inc.. (djh, )
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Microsoft Corp. to 9/22/2006; Nintendo of America, Inc. to 9/25/2006. (kjr, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 9/25/06 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/25/06. (djh, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 9/22/06 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/25/06. (djh, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Anascape, Ltd re 4 Order, ANASCAPE, LTD.'S PROPOSED GROUPING OF PATENTS (Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anascape, Ltd. Nintendo of America, Inc. served on 8/4/2006 by personal service to C. T. Corporation, answer due 8/24/2006. (kjr, )
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anascape, Ltd. Microsoft Corp. served on 8/7/2006 by personal service c/o Corporation Service Company, answer due 8/28/2006. (kjr, )
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR MICROSOFT CORP. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ANASCAPE, LTD.'S COMPLAINT by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION (approved) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert J Gunther, Jr for Nintendo of America, Inc. (kjr, )
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION (approved) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James S Blank for Nintendo of America, Inc. (kjr, )
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Robert J. Gunther, Jr. and James S. Blank; Fee: $50.00, receipt number: 6-1-6437 (kjr, )
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Anascape propose a logical grouping of the patents, including no more than four patents in each group. This proposal must be submitted by August 25, 2006. The court will use Anascape's proposed groupings in determining how to best group the patents for the Markman hearing and other purposes. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/16/06. (kjr, ) Modified on 8/16/2006 (kjr, ).
August 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 9-1-421 (djh, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anascape, Ltd. contained within complaint 1 (djh, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc. and handed back to atty for service (djh, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (djh, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anascape, Ltd (djh, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (35:0271 Patent Infringement) against Microsoft Corp., Nintendo of America, Inc. , filed by Anascape, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit E cont# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit L cont# 15 Exhibit L cont)(djh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anascape, Ltd v. Microsoft Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corp.
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Represented By: James S Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anascape, Ltd
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corp.
Represented By: J Christopher Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Represented By: James S Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Anascape, Ltd
Represented By: Douglas A Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?