Guzman v. Cockrell et al
Plaintiff: |
Vicente Guzman |
Defendant: |
Janie Cockrell, Judy Tobias, Chris Smith, Virgil McMullin, Shirley A Self, Joni White, Travis Primrose and FNU Lieutenant |
Case Number: |
9:2010cv00111 |
Filed: |
August 24, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Lufkin Office |
County: |
Angelina |
Presiding Judge: |
Ron Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
Judith K. Guthrie |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
79
PLEASE IGNORE, FILED IN ERROR MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 60 is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment 65-68 are DENIED. Plaintiff's comp laint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.Plaintiff shall take nothing as a result of this lawsuit. The parties are to bear their own costs and fees. All pending motions including but not limited to Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery 71 , are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 9/4/12. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/5/2012 (ljw, ).
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. Ordered that Defendant's motion for summary judgment (docket entry #60) is hereby granted. Ordered that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (docket entries #65-68) is hereby denied. Ordered that Plaintiff&# 039;s complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff shall take nothing as a result of this lawsuit. Ordered that the parties are to bear their own costs and fees. Ordered that any motion not previously ruled on, including but not limited to Plaintiff's motion for discovery (docket entry #71), is hereby denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 8/30/2012. (bjc)
|
November 10, 2011 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Amend Complaint is denied and the Plaintiff's 54 proposed amended complaint is stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 11/10/11. (ljw, )
|
September 15, 2011 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 9/15/11. (ljw, )
|
June 20, 2011 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 33 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Vicente Guzman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 6/20/11. (ljw, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?