Chavez, Jr. v. Lane et al
Plaintiff: |
Nazario Chavez, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Darron Lane, Debbie K Erwin and Gregory H Oliver |
Case Number: |
9:2011cv00121 |
Filed: |
July 21, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Lufkin Office |
County: |
Angelina |
Presiding Judge: |
Ron Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
Judith K. Guthrie |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 29, 2012 |
Filing
114
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's order for Review and Appeal pleading 111 , construed as a Motion to Appeal to a District Judge, is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 11/29/12. (ljw, )
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Relief From a Judgment or Order is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 11/19/12. (ljw, )
|
September 27, 2012 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER. Plaintiff-Appellant's 89 Motion for an Extension of Time in which to file a challenge to the Final Judgment is DENIED as unnecessary. Plaintiff-Appellant's 89 Motion for an Extension of Time to file a notice of appeal is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 9/27/12. (ljw, )
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
85
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies is granted. Any motion not previously ruled on, including but not limited to 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Jud gment, second 82 Motion for Production of Documents and 84 Motion to Strike are DENIED. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 8/20/12. (ljw, )
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's 71 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 7/1/12. (ljw, )
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's 63 Declaration for Entry of Default construed as a Motion for Entry of Default, is hereby denied. To the extent the motion might be construed as a motion for default judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), it is also DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 6/19/12. (ljw, )
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 43 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Nazario Chavez, Jr.. To the extent the motion might be construed as a motion for default judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), it is also DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 4/2/12. (ljw, )
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. The Plaintiff may proceed with his excessive use of force claim against Defendant Lane. The Plaintiff's remaining civil rights claims against Defendants Erwin and Oliver are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 2/13/12. (ljw, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?