Hopson-Lloyd et al v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Christian A. Hopson and Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd
Defendant: Nicole LoStracco, The Crater Club, Lieutenant Craig Cummings, Linda Jones, Rhonda Modiesette, Amber Quinn, Namita Patel, Deputy Sal Landeros, Continental Inn Suites, Jimmy D Jones, Captain B Ball, Deputy R Bradely Jimmerson, A.D. Jesus Adame, LaRhonda Osbourn, Jayesh Khandubhai Patel, Doctor Robert E Lyon, Nacogdoches Memeorial Hospital EMS, Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC, Sergeant Roy Mobley, Vania Sanjay Patel, Russell Wright, Jairo Salinas, Sergio Jesus Flores, Jason Bridges, Paul Cipriani, Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, Charley Weaver, Stephen C Brady, John Ericson, Keifer Collins, Robert Smith, Cassidy L Jones, Tinger Thompson, Steven Rayburn and Carol R Brady
Case Number: 9:2018cv00211
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Lufkin Office
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, P.A., Dr. Robert E. Lyon, D.O., and Larhonda Osborns re Urged Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Rule 12(E) Motion for More Definite Statement by Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, Robert E Lyon, LaRhonda Osbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rickman, Jess)
January 9, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss The Cater Club's Rule 12(b)(6) Re-Urged Motion to Dismiss by The Crater Club. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Rusk County Defendants' Re-Urged Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Carol R Brady, Stephen C Brady, Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Richard)
December 10, 2018 The following attorney was contacted on December 10, 2018 regarding admission requirements to The Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiff's atty Keith L. Altman.. (aam, )
December 7, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, )
December 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin per Standing Referral Order RC-72.4 (ljw, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01285. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #49 Order Accepting #48 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation. (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
December 6, 2018 ***DISREGARD***Clerk's Notice of Mailing a certified copy of the #49 Order Accepting #49 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation on Motion re: #8 , #20 , #38 Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division, docket sheet and the Letter of Remand to the Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division. (ykp) Modified on 12/6/2018 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
December 6, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:49. Thu Dec 6 16:48:00 CST 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ACCEPTING #48 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE : #20 Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division. Plaintiff's case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/6/2018) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
November 7, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:48. Wed Nov 7 15:59:35 CST 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation on Motion re: #8 , #20 , #38 Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division. Accordingly, this case should be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division, where the events at issue occurred and where the vast majority of Defendants are located. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/7/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright re: #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 46 OBJECTION filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright re: #45 Response/Objection,, (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE filed by Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd, The Estate of Christian A. Hopson re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division , #30 Second Supplement MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division, #38 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division and Stay Pending Deadlines, #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s)) (Obi, Emmanuel) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 26, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF #44. Fri Oct 26 12:51:24 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiffs' counsel advised the Court via email on October 24, 2018 that he would be filing an emergency motion on that date. Counsel also called this Court's chambers with respect to his proposed emergency motion. Upon review of the docket, Plaintiffs have not filed any such motion nor have they responded to a single motion filed by Defendants. Plaintiffs are GRANTED until October 30, 2018 to file a motion for leave to file an out-of-time response to Nagadoches County Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, Doc. #8 , with the proposed response attached thereto as required by the Northern District of Texas' Local Civil Rules. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/26/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/24/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Mitchell Beard on behalf of B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Beard, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 41 Supplemental Document by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Third Supplement). (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 3, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF #40. Wed Oct 3 15:43:12 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the parties' filing of the Agreed Motion to Transfer Venue, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/04/2018 is cancelled. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/3/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, Robert E Lyon, LaRhonda Osbourn re: #33 Order, (Rickman, Jess) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 38 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division and Stay Pending Deadlines filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE filed by Carol R Brady, Stephen C Brady, Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC re: #33 Order, (Miller, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Crater Club (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holmes, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Carol R Brady, Stephen C Brady, Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Mistaken Identify sent to Emmanuel Obi filed by Keifer Collins. (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:33. Tue Sep 25 16:40:27 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(a) and 26(f), the Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling conference hearing on 10/4/2018, at 10:00 a.m., at the United States District Court, II 00 Commerce Street, Comiroom 1632, Dallas, Texas 75242. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/25/2018) (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:32. Tue Sep 25 14:35:18 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith Altman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/24/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jairo Salinas. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 30 Second Supplement MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 19, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:27, 29. Wed Sep 19 16:09:07 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Crater Club answer due 10/3/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/19/2018) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED IN WRONG CASE*** Findings and Recommendations on Case re: The Court recommends that Petitioner's habeas corpus petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241 be dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/19/2018) (rekc) Modified on 9/19/2018 (rekc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Carol R Brady answer due 10/3/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/19/2018) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Continental Inn Suites, Jayesh Khandubhai Patel, Namita Patel, Vania Sanjay Patel with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pickelman, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9458485) filed by Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cert of Good Standing)Attorney Keith L Altman added to party Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd(pty:pla) (Altman, Keith) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Carol R Brady (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard G Miller added to party Carol R Brady(pty:dft) (Miller, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer The Crater Club's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Crater Club (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holmes, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 12, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22. Wed Sep 12 14:46:18 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS STEPHEN C. BRADY AND RUSK COUNTY TEXAS LAND INVESTORS, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: Defendants Stephen C. Brady and Rusk County Texas Land Investors, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/3/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/12/2018) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stephen C Brady, Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard G Miller added to party Stephen C Brady(pty:dft), Attorney Richard G Miller added to party Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC(pty:dft) (Miller, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, Robert E Lyon, LaRhonda Osbourn (Rickman, Jess) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, Robert E Lyon, LaRhonda Osbourn with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rickman, Jess) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 18 ADOPTION AND INCORPORATION OF PRIOR PLEADINGS; SUBJECT THERETO to #1 Complaint filed by Cassidy L Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 17 ADOPTION AND INCORPORATION OF PRIOR PLEADINGS; SUBJECT THERETO to #1 Complaint filed by Linda Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 7, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Fri Sep 7 13:53:34 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTEL DEFENDANTS' #10 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: The Court GRANTS the Motion and orders that the Motel Defendants file an answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 9/18/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/7/2018) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support filed by Craig Cummings, Steven Rayburn, Robert Smith Attorney Seth Byron Dennis added to party Craig Cummings(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Byron Dennis added to party Steven Rayburn(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Byron Dennis added to party Robert Smith(pty:dft) (Dennis, Seth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay (Shultea Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosure) filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Nicole LoStracco(pty:dft) (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 Supplemental Document by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division . (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Adoption and Incorporation of Prior Pleadings re: #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6); Alternatively, Defendants' Rule 12(e) Motion and Schultea Moiton for a More Definite Statement filed by Nicole LoStracco (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Keifer Collins re: #1 Complaint. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Continental Inn Suites, Jayesh Khandubhai Patel, Namita Patel, Vania Sanjay Patel Attorney Matthew R Pickelman added to party Continental Inn Suites(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew R Pickelman added to party Jayesh Khandubhai Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew R Pickelman added to party Namita Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew R Pickelman added to party Vania Sanjay Patel(pty:dft) (Pickelman, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6); Alternatively, Defendants' Rule 12(e) Motion and Schultea Moiton for a More Definite Statement filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by B Ball, Jason Bridges, John Ericson, R Bradely Jimmerson, Jimmy D Jones, Sal Landeros, Roy Mobley, Amber Quinn, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert S Davis added to party B Ball(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Jason Bridges(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party John Ericson(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party R Bradely Jimmerson(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Jimmy D Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Sal Landeros(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Roy Mobley(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Amber Quinn(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Tinger Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Charley Weaver(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Davis added to party Russell Wright(pty:dft) (Davis, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 27, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Aug 27 15:01:22 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas answer due 9/11/2018; Robert E Lyon answer due 9/11/2018; LaRhonda Osbourn answer due 9/11/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/27/2018) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, Robert E Lyon, LaRhonda Osbourn (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jess C Rickman, III added to party Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas(pty:dft), Attorney Jess C Rickman, III added to party Robert E Lyon(pty:dft), Attorney Jess C Rickman, III added to party LaRhonda Osbourn(pty:dft) (Rickman, Jess) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to A.D. Jesus Adame, B Ball, Carol R Brady, Stephen C Brady, Jason Bridges, Paul Cipriani, Keifer Collins, Continental Inn Suites, Craig Cummings, John Ericson, Sergio Jesus Flores, Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas, R Bradely Jimmerson, Cassidy L Jones, Jimmy D Jones, Linda Jones, Sal Landeros, Nicole LoStracco, Robert E Lyon, Roy Mobley, Rhonda Modiesette, Nacogdoches Memeorial Hospital EMS, LaRhonda Osbourn, Jayesh Khandubhai Patel, Namita Patel, Vania Sanjay Patel, Amber Quinn, Steven Rayburn, Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC, Jairo Salinas, Robert Smith, The Crater Club, Tinger Thompson, Charley Weaver, Russell Wright. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd, The Estate of Christian A. Hopson. (Obi, Emmanuel) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 3 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:18-cv-1285-S. (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
May 19, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]
May 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9200475) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Obi, Emmanuel) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson-Lloyd et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Christian A. Hopson
Represented By: Emmanuel U. Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyveria Hopson-Lloyd
Represented By: Emmanuel U. Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole LoStracco
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Crater Club
Represented By: James A Holmes
Represented By: James Andrew Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Craig Cummings
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Modiesette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Quinn
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namita Patel
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Lautin
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Pickelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sal Landeros
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Inn Suites
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Lautin
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Pickelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy D Jones
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain B Ball
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy R Bradely Jimmerson
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D. Jesus Adame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaRhonda Osbourn
Represented By: Condred Curtis Roberts, III
Represented By: Jess C Rickman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayesh Khandubhai Patel
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Lautin
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Pickelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Robert E Lyon
Represented By: Condred Curtis Roberts, III
Represented By: Jess C Rickman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nacogdoches Memeorial Hospital EMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusk County Land Texas Land Investors LLC
Represented By: Richard G Miller
Represented By: Douglas D Fletcher
Represented By: David C Colley
Represented By: Douglas Dickson Fletcher
Represented By: Richard Gary Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Roy Mobley
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vania Sanjay Patel
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Lautin
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Pickelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Wright
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Lautin
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jairo Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Jesus Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bridges
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Cipriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forensic Medical Management Services of Texas
Represented By: Condred Curtis Roberts, III
Represented By: Jess C Rickman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charley Weaver
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C Brady
Represented By: Richard G Miller
Represented By: Douglas D Fletcher
Represented By: David C Colley
Represented By: Douglas Dickson Fletcher
Represented By: Richard Gary Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ericson
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keifer Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smith
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassidy L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinger Thompson
Represented By: Robert S Davis
Represented By: J Mitchell Beard
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rayburn
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol R Brady
Represented By: Richard G Miller
Represented By: Douglas D Fletcher
Represented By: David C Colley
Represented By: Douglas Dickson Fletcher
Represented By: Richard Gary Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?