Wilson v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: thomas wilson
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv00008
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER governing proceedings. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before 3/25/2019. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 10:30 AM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/6/2019. (bjc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by General Motors LLC.(Cox, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to General Motors LLC. and emailed back to Attorney in Charge for service. (ljw, )
January 25, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin per Standing Referral Order RC-72.4. (ljw, )
January 25, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7109834.), filed by thomas wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2019 with flattened version) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: thomas wilson
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?