Cossey v. Advertising Higher, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael S Cossey
Defendant: Ron Francois and Advertising Higher, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00024
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: The court grants #8 Unopposed Motion To Appear By Telephone. Plaintiff's counsel may appear and be heard by telephone at the Initial Conference set for April 26, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall call the telephone number provided by the court. Entered by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 04/11/2019. (rc2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION Appear by telephone at Initial Scheduling Conference re Notice of Hearing by Michael S Cossey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scalise, Charles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L Scalise on behalf of Michael S Cossey (Scalise, Charles)
April 10, 2019 NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2019 11:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Location change only.(ttp, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #5 Status Report(PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER). (Scalise, Charles) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ljw, ).
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Michael S Cossey. (Scalise, Charles)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before March 18, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on April 26, 2019 at 11:00 a.m., in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/27/19. (ljw, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants' Original ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Amended Petition by Advertising Higher, Inc., Ron Francois.(Simmons, Larry)
February 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 ORIGINAL Petition (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Michael S Cossey.(ljw, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advertising Higher, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7141363), filed by Advertising Higher, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Simmons, Larry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cossey v. Advertising Higher, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Francois
Represented By: Larry James Simmons, Jr
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Krone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advertising Higher, Inc.
Represented By: Larry James Simmons, Jr
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Krone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Cossey
Represented By: Daniel B. Ross
Represented By: Charles L Scalise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?