Hand v. Merchants Credit Guide Company et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Hand
Defendant: Merchants Credit Guide Company and Trans Union Corp
Case Number: 9:2019cv00085
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. Plaintiff Tamara Hand and Defendants Merchants Credit Guide Company and Trans Union Corporation, or their counsel, shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this court on or before August 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 7/12/19. (ljw, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Tamara Hand (Motil, Gregory)
July 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Merchants Credit Guide Company to 7/19/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Merchants Credit Guide Company.( Jobe, Jason) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/3/2019 with flattened document) (bjc, ). Modified on 7/3/2019 (bjc, ).
June 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Trans Union Corp to 7/12/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, )
June 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Merchants Credit Guide Company to 7/5/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union Corp identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union Corp. (Sheldon, Paul)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Trans Union Corp.(Sheldon, Paul) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/21/2019 with flattened image) (bjc, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Merchants Credit Guide Company.( Jobe, Jason)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Hand. Merchants Credit Guide Company served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Hand. Trans Union Corp served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Merchants Credit Guide Company & Trans Union Corp. and emailed back to Attorney for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ljw, )
May 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tamara Hand. (ljw, )
May 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7279109.), filed by Tamara Hand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hand v. Merchants Credit Guide Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Credit Guide Company
Represented By: Jason Ray Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union Corp
Represented By: Paul W Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hand
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?