Doe I v. Huntington Independent School District
Plaintiff: John Doe I
Defendant: Huntington Independent School District
Case Number: 9:2019cv00133
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs may proceed as identified as John Doe I and John Doe II, a Minor. Entered by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/19/2019. (rc2, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Governing Proceedings. by John Doe I. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchison, Susan)
September 19, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR by Attorney. Document # 5, Motion for Reconsideration. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney to refile*** (ljw, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Governing Proceedings by John Doe I. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchison, Susan) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ljw, ). Modified on 9/19/2019 (ljw, ).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before September 30, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on November 15, 2019 at 11:00 a.m., in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/11/19. (ljw, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Huntington Independent School District.(Bradshaw, Miles)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Huntington Independent School District and emailed back to Attorney for service. (ljw, )
August 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
August 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUNTINGTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7380148.), filed by JOHN DOE I, JOHN DOE II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hutchison, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe I v. Huntington Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Independent School District
Represented By: Miles Thomas Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe I
Represented By: Susan E Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?