Archuleta v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Rogelio Archuleta
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 9:2019cv00142
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response by Director, TDCJ-CID. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wawrzynski, Stephanie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie N. Wawrzynski on behalf of Director, TDCJ-CID (Wawrzynski, Stephanie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Rogelio Z Archuleta requesting docket sheet. (bjc, ) (mailed docket sheet 9/4/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE through the Attorney General for the State of Texas regarding #2 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State, by Laura Haney on 8/26/19. (ljw, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HABEAS PETITION - STATE. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Copy of order to Edward Marshall and Laura Haney via electronic noticing including petition and any supporting documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/23/19. (ljw, )
August 19, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-48747. (mjc, )
August 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rogelio Archuleta.(ljw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archuleta v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Represented By: Stephanie N. Wawrzynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rogelio Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?