Oliver v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Oliver
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 9:2019cv00160
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled for October 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Giblin is CANCELLED, at this time, due to the order staying the case. (saw, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. The parties are directed to notify the court with a written report of settlement or case update on or before December 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 10/2/19. (ljw, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/27/19. (ljw, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Robert Weir on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Weir, Jared)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (saw, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffith, Joseph)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffith, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Griffith, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Glenn Dial on behalf of All Defendants (Dial, Karl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Samir Wahby on behalf of All Defendants (Wahby, Peter)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph P Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 The following attorneys were contacted via email on 9/12/2019 regarding admission requirements to The Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiff's Attorney Daniel Seltz and Wendy Fleishman, and Defendant Attorney Richard B North, Jr.. (ljw, )
September 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00515. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #9 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
May 3, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Audrey Oliver. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. NOTE: Attorney Jeff Seldomridge was terminated as the attorney for Audrey Oliver on 4/15/16 when the Order on the Motion to Substitute was issued in the Lead Case 2:15-md-2641-DGC at (Doc. 1464). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
May 3, 2016 Filing 7 *MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Audrey Oliver. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Seldomridge, Jeff) *Document filed in the wrong case. Attorney noticed to re-file document in correct case on 5/3/2016 (LSP). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX168937 as to Jeff Seldomridge. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Audrey Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeff Seldomridge on behalf of Audrey Oliver. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-515-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX168939 filed by Audrey Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Karl Glenn Dial
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Jared Robert Weir
Represented By: Peter Samir Wahby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Karl Glenn Dial
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Jared Robert Weir
Represented By: Peter Samir Wahby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?