Doe v. Stephan F. Austin State University
Plaintiff: Jane SFA-CM Doe
Defendant: Stephan F Austin State University
Case Number: 9:2019cv00201
Filed: November 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Stephan F Austin State University and emailed back to Attorney for service. (ljw, )
November 7, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR by Attorney. Document # 2, Request for Issuance of Summons. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney to email Summons to Clerk for issuance.*** (ljw, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE IGNORE NOTICE by Jane SFA-CM Doe Requesting Issuance of Summons (Gorman, Terry) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ljw, ).
November 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
November 4, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL against Stephan F. Austin State University( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7504874.), filed by Jane SFA-CM Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gorman, Terry) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Stephan F. Austin State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane SFA-CM Doe
Represented By: Terry P Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan F Austin State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?