Wilder v. Stephen F. Austin State University
Plaintiff: Ann Wilder
Defendant: Stephen F. Austin State University
Case Number: 9:2020cv00040
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS. The deadline for Defendant to file its responsive pleading or motion to dismiss is Monday, June 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/8/20. (ljw, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Agreed MOTION to Stay by Stephen F. Austin State University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Tanya)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tanya Robinson on behalf of Stephen F. Austin State University. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7726157. (jmv, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued and electronically sent to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Stephen F. Austin State University. (bjc, )
March 5, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, )
March 5, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
March 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen F. Austin State University ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7693749.), filed by Ann Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Franklin, Tanner) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 3/5/2020) (ljw, ). (Main Document 1 replaced with Signed version on 3/5/2020) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. Stephen F. Austin State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Austin State University
Represented By: Tanya Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Wilder
Represented By: Tanner Gerald McClure Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?