Solomon v. Yosief
Plaintiff: Esseyas Debesay Solomon
Defendant: Kidana Yosief
Case Number: 9:2020cv00145
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. The Court ASSIGNS this case to the Honorable Michael J. Truncale for all purposes. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/30/20. (ljw, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Kidana Yosief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knockaert, Erik)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esseyas Debesay Solomon. Kidana Yosief served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Miller, Camille)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Kidana Yosief and emailed to Attorney in charge for service. (ljw, )
July 6, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ljw, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121) filed by Esseyas Debesay Solomon. (ljw, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kidana Yosief ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7871877.), filed by Esseyas Debesay Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es), #3 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form)(Miller, Camille) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/6/2020) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Yosief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidana Yosief
Represented By: Erik Andrew Knockaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esseyas Debesay Solomon
Represented By: Camille M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?