The State Of Texas v. Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC
Plaintiff: The State Of Texas
Defendant: Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC
Case Number: 9:2020cv00172
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial is set for 6/28/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/24/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/6/20. (ljw, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION to Remand. Hearing is set for 10/21/2020 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/6/20. (ljw, )
October 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 10/2/2020 via telephone. Attorneys present: Tommy Coleman, Leigh Hon, Mathis Bishop, Jorge Garcia. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None presetn.) (jmv, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Mathis)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bishop, Mathis)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by The State Of Texas. (Coleman, Tommy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before September 11, 2020. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on October 2, 2020 at 11:30 a.m., via telephone. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/20/20. (ljw, )
August 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn no longer assigned to case. (ljw, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. For effective disposition of cases in the Eastern District of Texas, this Lufkin civil case is hereby transferred from Judge Ron Clark to Judge Michael Truncale. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 8/19/20. (ljw, )
August 14, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, )
August 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
August 14, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 ORIGINAL NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE (Filed in state Court) against Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC, filed by The State Of Texas.(ljw, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC from 411th District Court, Polk County, case number CIV33808. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7946096), filed by Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bishop, Mathis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State Of Texas v. Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Learjet 31A Bearing Serial Number 080 and Assigned and Displaying Registration/Tail Number N260RC
Represented By: Mathis B Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State Of Texas
Represented By: Tommy L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?