Stewart v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Correctional Institutional Division (CID) et al
Plaintiff: Kendrick Stewart
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Correctional Institutional Division (CID) and Donald Muniz
Case Number: 9:2021cv00216
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the claims of each of the plaintiffs shall proceed as separate actions. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of each plaintiff other than plaintiff Jones into a separate lawsuit and assign each resulting lawsuit a separate civil action number. The resulting cases should be assigned according to the regular practice for allotment of newly-filed civil actions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/8/21. (ljw, )
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 & #7 seeking leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff has also filed a motion #6 seeking appointed counsel. That motion is DENIED without prejudice as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 6/1/21. (ljw, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Curtis Jones from: Wynne Unit Trusty Camp 810 FM 2821 Huntsville TX 77349 to: 3616 Far West Blvd No. 117-441 Austin, TX 78731 (bjc, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Curtis Jones (ljw, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Donald Muniz, Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Correctional Institutional Division (CID), filed by William Curtis Jones.(ljw, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by William Curtis Jones. (ljw, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William Curtis Jones. (ljw, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint to add Plaintiffs and also Change of Address by William Curtis Jones. (ljw, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-01220. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (bjc, )
December 21, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (bjc, )
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Lufkin Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/21/2020.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter mailed to William Curtis Jones. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/21/2020.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402 DUE), filed by William Curtis Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/21/2020.]
December 14, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/21/2020.]
December 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/21/2020.]
December 14, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Correctional Institutional Division (CID) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Correctional Institutional Division (CID)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?