Rodriguez v. C&A Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Tudon Rodriguez
Respondent: C&A Trucking, LLC, Kelly Don Burt and Source Equipment Leasing and Management
Case Number: 9:2024cv00059
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-00020. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 28, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ljw)
March 28, 2024 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified. (dar1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 03/27/2024, filed. (dar1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas-Lufkin Division by C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Crash Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Pltfs Original Petition, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/11/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(SaraCelis, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE Notice of Related Litigation and Affected Non-Parties by C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed. (Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE Defendants Notice of Entities with Financial Interest by C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed. (Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed.(Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Larry J. Goldman as attorney in charge of C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed.(Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Defendants Notice of Counsel of Record by C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed. (Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE Defendant C&A Trucking and Source Equipment Leasing;'s Notice to Adverse Pary of Removal to Federal Court by C&A Trucking, LLC, Source Equipment Leasing and Management, filed. (Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 107th Judicial District Court, Cameron County, Texas, case number 2023-DCL-03721 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31234264) filed by Source Equipment Leasing and Management, C&A Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Pltf. Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-State Docs, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Index for Removal)(Goldman, Larry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/28/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. C&A Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Tudon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C&A Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Don Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Source Equipment Leasing and Management
Represented By: Larry J Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?