DB2017 LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: DB2017, LLC
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3, The Bank Of New York Mellon, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC and The Bank of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Case copied to 3:19cv1214-N. Transfer to Dallas Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Court, having considered #5 Defendants' Request to Transfer Removal to the Proper Division of the Northern District, filed May 17, 2019, is of the opinion that the same should be GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that the above-styled and -numbered Civil action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/20/2019) (jmc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Transfer Removal to the Proper Division of the Northern District, re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank Of New York Mellon (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Knox, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3 identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Carrington Companies, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Manning, Matt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Cases Removed from State Court to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3. (Knox, Matthew) Modified on 5/17/2019 (jak).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 14th Judicial District Court, Dallas Texas, case number DC-19-06290 filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9991714) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Knox, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DB2017 LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3
Represented By: Matthew A Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Matthew A Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Matthew A Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Matthew A Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB2017, LLC
Represented By: Robert W Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?