Wallace v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Timothy Randolph Wallace
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 1:2019cv00127
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jul 9 10:41:38 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court has considered Petitioner's letter requesting the instant petition be dismissed #4 and finds that it should be DENIED as moot. This civil action was administratively closed on June 17, 2019, pursuant to the sanction order entered in Wallace v. Cockerell, Civil Action No. 3:02-CV-1807-M (N.D. Tex. March 27, 2003). SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/9/2019) (jak)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Timothy Randolph Wallace. (mmg)
June 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Jun 17 14:21:47 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 1:19-cv-127. The sanction order was originally filed in: 3:02-cv-1807-M and states: The Clerk of Court shall accept no future civil actions submitted by plaintiff for filing, either directly or indirectly by transfer, unless attached to a motion for leave to file such action. If plaintiff attempts to file a civil action without the required motion or attachments, the Clerk of the Court is directed to return the unfiled documents to plaintiff with a copy of the Judgment entered in this case. In addition, the Clerk of the Court shall accept no future civil actions submitted by plaintiff for filing, either directly or indirectly by transfer, unless accompanied by the requisite filing fee or a separate affidavit or declaration that demonstrates that plaintiff is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. If plaintiff attempts to file a civil action without the required fee or separate affidavit or declaration, the Clerk of the Court is directed to return the unfiled documents to plaintiff with a copy of the Judgment entered in this case. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (jak)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Timothy Randolph Wallace. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jak)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Randolph Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?